Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2960284

EP2960284 - RUBBER COMPOSITION, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
For all designated states
Otsuka Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-27, Otedori 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-0021 / JP
[2018/31]
Former [2016/01]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
For all designated states
Otsuka Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-27, Otedori 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-0021 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YUKIMURA, Noriaki
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
Technical Center
3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
02 / YOSHIZAWA, Takahiro
c/o Bridgestone Corporation
Technical Center
3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi
Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
03 / KODAMA, Kazuhiro
c/o OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
463 Kagasuno
Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
04 / YUASA, Hiroaki
c/o OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
463 Kagasuno
Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
05 / SHIINA, Noriaki
c/o OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
463 Kagasuno
Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
06 / SATO, Takashi
c/o OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
463 Kagasuno
Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
07 / ISHITOBI, Hiroyuki
c/o OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
463 Kagasuno
Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
08 / UENO, Mifuyu
c/o OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
463 Kagasuno
Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
09 / NAKASHIMA, Shinya
c/o OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
463 Kagasuno
Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
10 / ABE, Masaki
c/o OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
463 Kagasuno
Kawauchi-cho
Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2016/01]
Application number, filing date14745896.230.01.2014
[2016/01]
WO2014JP52173
Priority number, dateJP2013001626230.01.2013         Original published format: JP 2013016262
[2016/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014119694
Date:07.08.2014
Language:JA
[2014/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2960284
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2960284
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.08.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:C08L7/00, B60C1/00, B60C11/00, C08K3/00, C08K5/31, C08L9/00, C08K3/04, C08K5/36, C08K5/3462, C08K5/3447, C08K5/3445
[2016/43]
Former International [2016/01]C08L7/00, B60C1/00, B60C11/00, C08K3/00, C08K5/31, C08L9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND LUFTREIFEN DAMIT[2016/01]
English:RUBBER COMPOSITION, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE USING SAME[2016/01]
French:COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC ET PNEUMATIQUE À BASE DE CELLE-CI[2016/01]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2015Translation filed 
30.07.2015National basic fee paid 
30.07.2015Search fee paid 
30.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/53]
21.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
11.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.04.2018Fee for grant paid
20.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.07.2017
Opposition(s)03.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
GB30.01.2019
IE30.01.2019
LU30.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
CH31.01.2019
LI31.01.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/04]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
GB30.01.2019
LU30.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
CH31.01.2019
LI31.01.2019
Former [2020/03]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
GB30.01.2019
LU30.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
Former [2019/51]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
LU30.01.2019
BE31.01.2019
Former [2019/44]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
LU30.01.2019
Former [2019/40]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT01.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO02094928  (RESSOURCES EN INNOVATION [FR], et al) [X] 1-8,12 * page 1 - page 2 * * example - * [A] 9-11
 [A]  - Teruya Seki, "NII-Electronic Library Service", (19660101), URL: https://www.jstage.jst.go.jp/article/yakushi1947/86/8/86_8_665/_article, (20160913), XP055302197 [A] 1-12 * page 667; figure Chart 2; compounds X, XI *
International search[A]WO2012031183  (CABOT CORP [US], et al);
 [A]JP2004026924  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO);
 [A]JP2011089031  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD);
 [A]JP2005529221  (SOCIETE DE TECHNOLOGIE MICHELIN);
 [A]JPS62184036  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [A]JPH09278942  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND);
 [A]JP2000239446  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD)
by applicantJPH10330549