Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2951977

EP2951977 - SECURITY DEVICE IMPLEMENTING NETWORK FLOW PREDICTION, AND FLOW OWNERSHIP ASSIGNMENT AND EVENT AGGREGATION IN A DISTRIBUTED PROCESSOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Palo Alto Networks, Inc.
4401 Great America Parkway
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2015/50]
Inventor(s)01 / ROBERSON, William, A.
4401 Great America Parkway
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
02 / XU, Wilson
4401 Great America Parkway
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[2017/43]
Former [2015/50]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
WP Thompson
55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Application number, filing date14746596.729.01.2014
[2015/50]
WO2014US13689
Priority number, dateUS201361758661P30.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361758661 P
US201361758647P30.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361758647 P
US201361758651P30.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361758651 P
US20131384069115.03.2013         Original published format: US201313840691
US20131384073515.03.2013         Original published format: US201313840735
US20131384078015.03.2013         Original published format: US201313840780
[2015/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014120838
Date:07.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2951977
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014
[2015/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2951977
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L12/851, H04L12/931
[2016/39]
Former International [2015/50]H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE NETZFLUSSVORHERSAGE SOWIE FÜR FLUSSEIGENTUMSZUWEISUNG UND EREIGNISAGGREGATION IN EINEM VERTEILTEN PROZESSORSYSTEM[2015/50]
English:SECURITY DEVICE IMPLEMENTING NETWORK FLOW PREDICTION, AND FLOW OWNERSHIP ASSIGNMENT AND EVENT AGGREGATION IN A DISTRIBUTED PROCESSOR SYSTEM[2015/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ METTANT EN OEUVRE UNE PRÉDICTION DE FLUX RÉSEAU, ET ATTRIBUTION D'APPROPRIATION DE FLUX ET AGRÉGATION D'ÉVÉNEMENTS DANS UN SYSTÈME D'UNITÉS DE TRAITEMENT RÉPARTI[2015/50]
Entry into regional phase20.07.2015National basic fee paid 
20.07.2015Search fee paid 
20.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/50]
16.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.08.2017Fee for grant paid
23.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.09.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
15.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17188025.5  / EP3282672
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2017
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
LU29.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2018/47]
Former [2018/40]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US6633565  (BRONSTEIN ZVIKA [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 7 - line 46 * * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 16 * * column 8, line 10 - line 65 * * column 11, line 31 - line 54 * * column 13, line 1 - line 40 *;
 [A]US2012079101  (MUPPALA SURESH BABU [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] *;
 [A]US2012087240  (KARUNAKARAN KUMARA DAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] *;
 [A]US2010118885  (CONGDON PAUL T [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0046] *;
 [A]US2003041168  (MUSOLL ENRIQUE [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] *
International search[Y]US2004143734  (BUER MARK L [US], et al);
 [Y]US2012087240  (KARUNAKARAN KUMARA DAS [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010118885  (CONGDON PAUL T [US]);
 [Y]US2012079101  (MUPPALA SURESH BABU [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010172375  (ROCHON MICHEL [CA], et al);
 [Y]US2006126628  (LI YUNHONG [US], et al);
 [A]US2011116378  (RAMANKUTTY RAJESH [US], et al)