Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830605

EP2830605 - A COMBINATION MEDICAMENT COMPRISING PHENYLEPHRINE AND PARACETAMOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.10.2018
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2019Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AFT Pharmaceuticals Limited
Level 1, 129 Hurstmere Road Takapuna
Auckland 0622 / NZ
[2015/06]
Inventor(s)01 / ATKINSON, Hartley Campbell
16 Brett Avenue
Takapuna Auckland 0622 / NZ
[N/P]
Former [2015/06]01 / ATKINSON, Hartley Campbell
16 Brett Avenue
Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 / NZ
Representative(s)Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/06]Sayer, Robert David , et al
Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way
Croydon, Surrey CR0 0XZ / GB
Application number, filing date14746905.007.01.2014
WO2014NZ00001
Priority number, dateNZ2013060665904.02.2013         Original published format: NZ 60665913
NZ2013061013202.05.2013         Original published format: NZ 61013213
NZ2013061391802.08.2013         Original published format: NZ 61391813
NZ2013061802720.11.2013         Original published format: NZ 61802713
[2015/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014120021
Date:07.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830605
Date:04.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014
[2015/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU07.08.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/137, A61K31/135, A61K31/167, A61P11/02, A61P11/12
[2015/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/06]
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONSMEDIKAMENT MIT PHENYLEPHRIN UND PARACETAMOL[2015/06]
English:A COMBINATION MEDICAMENT COMPRISING PHENYLEPHRINE AND PARACETAMOL[2015/06]
French:COMBINAISON MÉDICAMENTEUSE COMPRENANT LA PHÉNYLÉPHRINE ET LE PARACÉTAMOL[2015/06]
Entry into regional phase28.10.2014National basic fee paid 
28.10.2014Search fee paid 
28.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/06]
10.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2016Observations by third parties
05.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2018Date of oral proceedings
11.06.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination21.01.2019Appeal received No.  T1298/19
29.03.2019Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2011104272  (HOU SUI YUEN EDDIE [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0176] * * claim 4 *;
 [I]WO2007125501  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 2, line 10ff * * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 * * example 1 * * claims 1-16 *;
 [A]WO2012090218  (ZOTA HEALTH CARE LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * * page 8, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; claims 1-6 *
International search[A]US4260600  (VALLE RONALD);
 [A]US2007254027  (MARTIN KELLY L [US], et al);
 [A]US2009230013  (BORN JASON ALAN [US], et al);
 [A]US2010136107  (PUTTACHARI SATISHA [IN], et al);
 [A]WO2004066978  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al);
 [A]  - COLDREX P.E, "Phenylephrine Sinus Tablets, Panadol Sinus Relief PE Tablets, Panadol Cold & Flu Max+Decongestant Tablets", NEW ZEALAND DATASHEET., (20120413), URL: http://www.medsafe.goyt.87/profs/datasheet/c/Coldrextab.pdf, (20131003), XP055154372
 [A]  - "Trial from ANZCTR.", AUSTRALIAN NEW ZEALAND CLINICAL TRIALS REGISTRY., (20120815), URL: https://www.anzctr.org.au/Trial/Regisiration/TrialReview.aspx?id=362877, (20131002), XP055154379
 [AP]  - ATKINSON HC ET AL., "Increased Phenylephrine Plasma Levels with Administration of Acetaminophen", THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20140320), vol. 370, no. 12, pages 1171 - 1172, XP055154380

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMc1313942
by applicantWO2009012590
    - Martindale
    - Drug Tx
otherWO2007113536
    - Beecham Group PLC, "Beechams Powders Capsules/Beechams Decongestant Plus With Paracetamol/Beechams Cold & Flu Capsules Product Characteristics", (20090306), pages 1 - 10, XP055273932
    - Ratiopharm GmbH, "Ratiopharm Cold & Flu Lemon Flavour 1000mg/12.2mg Powder for Oral Solution Product Characteristics", (20111111), pages 1 - 10, XP055273935
    - Reckitt Benckiser Healthcare (UK) Limited, "LEMSIP MAX BLACKCURRANT FLAVOUR TABLETS LEMSIP MAX LEMON FLAVOUR TABLETS (UK/H/1786-7 /001/DC) Public Assessment Report", (20100604), pages 1 - 30, XP055273936
    - R M NACLERIO et al., "Pathophysiology of nasal congestion", Int J Gen Med. 2010, (20100408), vol. 2010, no. 3, pages 47 - 57, XP055273939

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/IJGM.S8088