Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3137554

EP3137554 - AZOARYLS AS REVERSIBLY MODULATABLE TUBULIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ecole Normale Supérieure de Lyon
15 Parvis Rene Descartes
BP 7000
69342 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR
For all designated states
Université Claude Bernard Lyon 1
Domaine Scientifique de la Doua
43 Boulevard du 11 novembre 1918
69622 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
Ludwig-Maximilians-Universität München
Geschwister-Scholl-Platz 1
80539 München / DE
[2017/10]
Inventor(s)01 / THORN-SESHOLD, Oliver
Herzogstr. 117
80796 München / DE
02 / BOROWIAK, Malgorzata
Zabno 16
P-63-112 Brodnica / PL
03 / TRAUNER, Dirk
Schackstr. 6
80539 München / DE
04 / HASSERODT, Jens
5 avenue Valioud
F-69110 Sainte-Foy-lès-Lyon / FR
 [2017/15]
Former [2017/10]01 / THORN-SESHOLD, Oliver
Herzogstr. 117
80796 München / DE
02 / BOROWIAK, Malgorzata
Zabno 16
P-63-112 Brodnica / PL
03 / TRAUNER, Dirk
Schackstr. 6
80539 München / DE
04 / HASSERODT, Jens
130 rue Sully
F-69006 Lyon / FR
Representative(s)Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/10]Sarlin, Laure V.
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
51, avenue Jean-Jaurès
BP 7073
69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date14747127.029.04.2014
[2017/10]
WO2014IB01246
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015166295
Date:05.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3137554
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:C09B29/01, A61K41/00, C09B29/08
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/10]
TitleGerman:AZOARYLE ALS REVERSIBEL MODULIERBARE TUBULININHIBITOREN[2017/10]
English:AZOARYLS AS REVERSIBLY MODULATABLE TUBULIN INHIBITORS[2017/10]
French:AZOARYLES UTILISÉS COMME INHIBITEURS RÉVERSIBLEMENT MODULABLES DE TUBULINES[2017/10]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2016National basic fee paid 
18.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/10]
18.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]DE1117241  (HOECHST AG) [X] 1,2,4-6,23-26,32 * table on columns 7,8, 1st through 5th diazo component from below; column 7 - column 8 * * table on columns 9,10, 1st diazo component from the top *;
 [A]EP2116263  (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1-55 * abstract * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0094] *;
 [A]US2006035266  (KINOSHITA TAKATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * Formula 2; page 5 * * paragraph [0080] *;
 [X]  - ELLIS V. BROWN ET AL, "Hepatocarcinogenicity of the trimethyl homologs of 4-dimethylaminoazobenzene", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (19720201), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1021/jm00272a027, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 212 - 212, XP055143642 [X] 1,2,4-6,23-25,32 * table 1, 2nd cpd. from below;; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00272a027
 [X]  - LUKMANOV ET. AL., "Derivatives of Polytrifluoromethylbenzenes", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY USSR, (19771001), vol. 13, pages 1979 - 1985, XP009180492 [X] 1-6,23-26,32 * page 1980; compound VII *
 [A]  - RENNER C ET AL, "Azobenzene as conformational switch in model peptides", CHEMBIOCHEM - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (20060601), vol. 7, no. 6, doi:10.1002/CBIC.200500531, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 868 - 878, XP002500027 [A] 1,46 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200500531
 [AD]  - ORRIE M. FRIEDMAN ET AL, "Preparation of Azo Compounds for the Study of Inhibition of Tumor Growth", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19490901), vol. 71, no. 9, doi:10.1021/ja01177a018, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 3010 - 3013, XP055137547 [AD] 1-34 * page 3011; compound XIII *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01177a018
 [AD]  - Arnold M Seligman ET AL, "'4 STUDY OF T H E INHIBITION OF TUMOR GROWTH IN MICE AND RATS WITH AZO COMPOUNDS s r u w OF THE EFFECT on tumor growth of", (19520531), pages 613 - 619, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1002/1097-0142(195205)5:3<613::AID-CNCR2820050325>3.0.CO;2-Z/asset/2820050325_ftp.pdf?v=1&t=hzl67lqc&s=d1830be2252355891be4cbf0152e1d98edce7e3c, (20140902), XP055137736 [AD] 1-34 * page 617; compound 30 *
 [A]  - TAKASHI KAMEI ET AL, "A photochromic ATP analogue driving a motor protein with reversible light-controlled motility: controlling velocity and binding manner of a kinesin-microtubule system in an in vitro motility assay", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (20120101), vol. 48, no. 61, doi:10.1039/c2cc33552b, ISSN 1359-7345, page 7625, XP055145416 [A] 1,36,46 * abstract * * scheme 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c2cc33552b
 [A]  - TUYOSHI FUKAMINATO, "Single-molecule fluorescence photoswitching: Design and synthesis of photoswitchable fluorescent molecules", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY C: PHOTOCHEMISTRY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 12, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.JPHOTOCHEMREV.2011.08.006, ISSN 1389-5567, (20110824), pages 177 - 208, (20110918), XP028115888 [A] 1,32,36,46 * scheme 3; page 184 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jphotochemrev.2011.08.006
 [A]  - M. K. ABDUL RAHIM ET AL, "Dynamic Photocontrol of the Gliding Motility of a Microtubule Driven by Kinesin on a Photoisomerizable Monolayer Surface", LANGMUIR, (20110906), vol. 27, no. 17, doi:10.1021/la2024499, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 10347 - 10350, XP055145479 [A] 1,32,36,46 * abstract * * chart 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la2024499
 [A]  - Tsuyoshi Fukaminato, Takashi Kamei, Nobuyuki Tamaoki, "Photoswitching of Microtubule Dynamics based on Azobenzene Photoisomerizations", International Symposium on Photochromism 2013, Berlin, (20130926), page 74, XP002731179 [A] 1,32,36,46 * page 74 *
 [A]  - QUANLI MA ET AL, "A Highly Selective Calix[4]arene-Based Chromoionophore for Ni2+", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20010101), no. 2, doi:10.1246/cl.2001.100, ISSN 0366-7022, pages 100 - 101, XP055146961 [A] 1,5 * scheme 1; page 100; compound 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.2001.100
by applicantUS2013023663
 WO2013021208
 US2009755
    - DR. NOBUYUKI; DR. FUKAMINATO, RESEARCH INSTITUTE FOR ELECTRONIC SCIENCE
    - G. C. TRON; T. PIRALI; G. SORBA; F. PAGLIAI; S. BUSACCA; A. A. GENAZZANI, J. MED CHEM., (2006), vol. 49, page 3033
    - G. M. TOZER; C. KANTHOU; C. S. PARKINS; S. A. HILL, INT J EXP PATHOL, (2002), vol. 83, page 21
    - M. CUSHMAN; D. NAGARATHNAM; D. GOPAL; H. M. HE; C. M. LIN; E. HAMEL, J. MED. CHEM., (1992), vol. 35, page 2293
    - K. OHSUMI; R. NAKAGAWA; Y. FUKUDA; T. HATANAKA; Y. MORINAGA; Y. NIHEI; K. OHISHI; Y. SUGA; Y. AKIYAMA; T. TSUJI, J. MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 41, page 3022
    - K. OHSUMI; T. HATANAKA; K. FUJITA; R. NAKAGAWA; Y. FUKUDA; Y. NIHEI; Y. SUGA; Y. MORINAGA; Y. AKIYAMA; T. TSUJI, BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1998), vol. 8, page 3153
    - N. MUR BLANCH; G. G. CHABOT; L. QUENTIN; D. SCHERMAN; S. BOURG; D. DAUZONNE, EUR. J. MED. CHEM., (2012), vol. 54, page 22
    - R. A. STANTON; K. M. GERNERT; J. H. NETTLES; R. ANEJA, MEDICINAL RESEARCH REVIEWS, (2011), vol. 31, page 443
    - K. HELMUT, CRC Handbookof Organic Photochemistry and Photobiology, CRC PRESS, (2003), vol. 1, 2
    - O. M. FRIEDMAN; R. M. GOFSTEIN; A. M. SELIGMAN, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1949), vol. 71, page 3010
    - A. M. SELIGMAN; R. M. GOFSTEIN; O. M. FRIEDMAN, CANCER, (1952), vol. 5, page 613
    - F. M. H. DE GROOT; L. W. A. VAN BERKOM; H. W. SCHEEREN, J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, page 3093
    - R. HEWITT; K. DANO, ENZYME PROTEIN, (1996), vol. 49, page 163
    - M. BIO; P. RAJAPUTRA; G. NKEPANG; S. G. AWUAH; A. M. L. HOSSION; Y. YOU, J. MED. CHEM., (2013), vol. 56, page 3936
    - E. ESCALONA-BENZ; M. E. JOCKOVICH; T. G. MURRAY; B. HAYDEN; E. HERNANDEZ; W. FEUER; J. J. WINDLE, INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 46, page 8
    - P. THOMSON; M. A. NAYLOR; S. A. EVERETT; M. R. L. STRATFORD; G. LEWIS; S. HILL; K. B. PATEL; P. WARDMAN; P. D. DAVIS, MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, (2006), vol. 5, page 2886
    - R. J. AMIR; D. SHABAT, CHEM. COMMUN., (2004), page 1614
    - D. SHABAT, J. POLYM. SCI., PART A: POLYM. CHEM., (2006), vol. 44, page 1569
    - D. SHABAT; R. J. AMIR; A. GOPIN; N. PESSAH; M. SHAMIS, CHEM.-EUR. J, (2004), vol. 10, page 2626
    - W. S. SAARI; J. E. SCHWERING; P. A. LYLE; S. J. SMITH; E. L. ENGELHARDT, J. MED. CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, page 97
    - M. A. DEWIT; E. R. GILLIES, ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2011), vol. 9, page 1846
    - O. THORN-SESHOLD; M. VARGAS-SANCHEZ; S. MCKEON; J. HASSERODT, CHEM. COMMUN., (2012), vol. 48, page 6253
    - M. H. LEE; J. H. HAN; J.-H. LEE; H. G. CHOI; C. KANG; J. S. KIM, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2012), vol. 134, page 17314
    - M. A. DEWIT; A. BEATON; E. R. GILLIES, J. POLYM. SCI., PART A: POLYM. CHEM., (2010), vol. 48, page 3977
    - M. N. LEVINE; R. T. RAINES, CHEM. SCI., (2012), vol. 3, page 2412
    - M. N. LEVINE; R. T. RAINES, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2011), vol. 418, page 247
    - S. S. CHANDRAN; K. A. DICKSON; R. T. RAINES, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, page 1652
    - M. FRECCERO, MINI-REV. ORG. CHEM., (2004), vol. 1, page 4 3
    - D. H. KWAN; H.-M. CHEN; K. RATANANIKOM; S. M. HANCOCK; Y. WATANABE; P. T. KONGSAEREE; A. L. SAMUELS; S. G. WITHERS, ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED., (2011), vol. 50, page 300
    - S. E. ROKITA; J. YANG; P. PANDE; W. A. GREENBERG, J. ORG. CHEM., (1997), vol. 62, page 3010
    - J. D. SELLARS; M. LANDRUM; A. CONGREVE; D. P. DIXON; J. A. MOSELY; A. BEEBY; R. EDWARDS; P. G. STEEL, ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2010), vol. 8, page 1610
    - E. E. WEINERT; R. DONDI; S. COLLOREDO-MELZ; K. N. FRANKENFIELD; C. H. MITCHELL; M. FRECCERO; S. E. ROKITA, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2006), vol. 128, page 11940
    - Z. ZHANG; K. TANABE; H. HATTA; S.-I. NISHIMOTO, ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 3, page 1905
    - P. WANG, ASIAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2013), vol. 2, page 452
    - G. R. PETTIT; C. TEMPLE; V. L. NARAYANAN; R. VARMA; M. J. SIMPSON; M. R. BOYD; G. A. RENER; N. BANSAL, ANTI-CANCER DRUG DES., (1995), vol. 10, page 299
    - C. M. LIN; S. B. SINGH; P. S. CHU; R. 0. DEMPCY; J. M. SCHMIDT; G. R. PETTIT; E. HAMEL, MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (1988), vol. 34, page 200
    - M. CUSHMAN; D. NAGARATHNAM; D. GOPAL; A. K. CHAKRABORTI; C. M. LIN; E. HAMEL, J. MED. CHEM., (1991), vol. 34, page 2579
    - K. SAOTOME; H. MORITA; M. UMEDA, TOXICOLOGY IN VITRO, (1989), vol. 3, page 317
    - A. A. BEHARRY; G. A. WOOLLEY, CHEM. SOC. REV., (2011), vol. 40, page 4422
    - J. P. KRISE; R. OLIYAI, Prodrugs, SPRINGER, (2007), vol. 5, page 801
    - S. APOT; I. TRANOY; F. TILLEQUIN; J. C. FLORENT; J. P. GESSON, CURRENT MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY -ANTI-CANCER AGENTS, (2002), vol. 2, page 155
    - M. ROOSEBOOM; J. N. M. COMMANDEUR; N. P. E. VERMEULEN, PHARMACOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (2004), vol. 56, page 53
    - B. SEDDON; L. R. KELLAND; P. WORKMAN, Suicide Gene Therapy : Methods and Reviews, SPRINGER, (2003), page 515
    - V. STELLA; S. DHARESHWAR, Prodrugs: Challenges and Rewards, SPRINGER, (2007), page 731
    - D. BLÉGER; J. SCHWARZ; A. M. BROUWER; S. HECHT, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2012), vol. 134, page 20597
    - J. GRIGGS; J. N. SKEPPER; G. A. SMITH; K. M. BRINDLE; J. C. METCALFE; R. HESKETH, AM J PATHOL, (2002), vol. 160, page 1097
    - C. CONDE; A. CACERES, NAT. REV. NEUROSCI., (2009), vol. 10, page 319
    - S. K. DUTCHER, CURR. OPIN. CELL BIOL., (2001), vol. 13, page 49
    - A. A. BEHARRY; G. A. WOOLLEY, PHOTOSENSITIVE MOLECULES FOR CONTROLLING BIOLOGICAL FUNCTION, (2011), page 171
    - E. MERINO, CHEM. SOC. REV., (2011), vol. 40, page 3835
    - H. E. GOTTLIEB; V. KOTLYAR; A. NUDELMAN, J. ORG. CHEM., (1997), vol. 62, page 7512
    - E. L. BASTOS; L. F. M. L. CISCATO; W. J. BAADER, SYNTH. COMMUN., (2005), vol. 35, page 1501
    - K. BAILEY; R. COWLING; E. W. TAN; D. WEBB, BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2004), vol. 12, page 595
    - K. SHINDO; R. NAKAMURA; I. CHINDA; Y. OHNISHI; S. HORINOUCHI; H. TAKAHASHI; K. IGUCHI; S. HARAYAMA; K. FURUKAWA; N. MISAWA, TETRAHEDRON, (2003), vol. 59, page 1895
    - T. NGUYEN; M. B. FRANCIS, ORG. LETT., (200305), page 3245
    - E. BOONACKER; C. J. F. VAN NOORDEN, J. HISTO. CYTO., (2001), vol. 49, page 1473
    - S. IBSEN; E. ZAHAVY; W. WRASIDLO; T. HAYASHI; J. NORTON; Y. SU; S. ADAMS; S. ESENER, PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (2013), vol. 89, page 698
    - A. A. BEHARRY; O. SADOVSKI; G. A. WOOLLEY, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2011), vol. 133, page 19684
    - I. NICOLETTI; G. MIGLIORATI; M. C. PAGLIACCI; F. GRIGNANI; C. RICCARDI, J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1991), vol. 139, page 271