EP3044014 - TYRE WITH EVOLVING ASYMMETRICAL SCULPTED DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2018/44] |
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
Former [2016/29] | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALLOT, Patrick Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin 23 Place des Carmes-Dechaux DGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux F-63040 Clermont Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
DELBOS, Mathieu Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin 23 Place des Carmes-Dechaux DGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 03 /
DAYET, Patrick Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin 23 Place des Carmes-Dechaux DGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 04 /
PINEAU, Jacky Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin 23 Place des Carmes-Dechaux DGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 05 /
MUHLHOFF, Olivier Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin 23 Place des Carmes-Dechaux DGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Lasson, Cédric Yves Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI F35 Ladoux 23, place des Carmes - Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Diernaz, Christian Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | ||
Former [2016/29] | Diernaz, Christian M. F. P. Michelin 23, place des Carmes Dechaux DGD/PI-F35-Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14747380.5 | 05.08.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014EP66764 | Priority number, date | FR20130058717 | 11.09.2013 Original published format: FR 1358717 | [2016/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015036175 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044014 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3044014 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/03 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
B60C11/033 (EP,US);
B60C11/03 (RU);
B60C11/0302 (US);
B60C11/0304 (EP,US);
B60C11/0323 (EP,US);
B60C11/04 (RU);
B60C2011/0353 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN MIT ENTFALTENDEM ASYMMETRISCHEM FORMDESIGN | [2016/29] | English: | TYRE WITH EVOLVING ASYMMETRICAL SCULPTED DESIGN | [2016/29] | French: | PNEU À DESSIN DE SCULPTURE ASYMÉTRIQUE ÉVOLUTIF | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 18.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2014 | AL | 27.03.2019 | AT | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | CZ | 27.03.2019 | DK | 27.03.2019 | EE | 27.03.2019 | ES | 27.03.2019 | FI | 27.03.2019 | HR | 27.03.2019 | IT | 27.03.2019 | LT | 27.03.2019 | LV | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | MK | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | NL | 27.03.2019 | PL | 27.03.2019 | RO | 27.03.2019 | RS | 27.03.2019 | SE | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SK | 27.03.2019 | SM | 27.03.2019 | TR | 27.03.2019 | BG | 27.06.2019 | NO | 27.06.2019 | GR | 28.06.2019 | IS | 27.07.2019 | PT | 27.07.2019 | GB | 05.08.2019 | IE | 05.08.2019 | LU | 05.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 05.08.2014 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
GB | 05.08.2019 | ||
IE | 05.08.2019 | ||
LU | 05.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 05.08.2014 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
GB | 05.08.2019 | ||
IE | 05.08.2019 | ||
LU | 05.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
GB | 05.08.2019 | ||
IE | 05.08.2019 | ||
LU | 05.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
GB | 05.08.2019 | ||
IE | 05.08.2019 | ||
LU | 05.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 05.08.2019 | ||
LU | 05.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
LU | 05.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011135000 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0069] , [0070] , [0082]; figures 4-6 *; | [A]WO2012069603 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0057] , [0058] , [0069]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP2546075 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0045] - [0047]; figure 2 * |