Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3027362

EP3027362 - TOOL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C. & E. Fein GmbH
Hans-Fein-Strasse 81
73529 Schwäbisch Gmünd-Bargau / DE
For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Wernerstrasse 1
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[2016/23]
Inventor(s)01 / KLABUNDE, Olaf
Hebelweg 2
89537 Giengen/Brenz / DE
02 / BLICKLE, Jürgen
Promenadeweg 38
73035 Göppingen / DE
03 / THOMASCHEWSKI, Walter
Echterdinger Str. 17
70794 Filderstadt / DE
04 / BEK, Fabian
Weidlestrasse 7
73560 Böbingen / DE
05 / DELFINI, Stefano
Grenchenstrasse 34
2544 Bettlach / CH
06 / FELLMANN, Willi
Meisenweg 6
4500 Solothurn / CH
07 / LÜSCHER, Bruno
Ackerstrasse 22
4800 Zofingen / CH
08 / BOZIC, Milan
Von Sury Weg 8
4500 Solothurn / CH
09 / MATHYS, Thomas
Schachweg 8
3250 Lyss / CH
10 / GROLIMUND, Daniel
Rainstrasse 37
4528 Zuchwil / CH
 [2018/15]
Former [2016/23]01 / KLABUNDE, Olaf
Hebelweg 2
89537 Giengen/Brenz / DE
02 / BLICKLE, Jürgen
Promenadeweg 38
73035 Göppingen / DE
03 / THOMASCHEWSKI, Walter
Echterdinger Str. 17
70794 Filderstadt / DE
04 / BEK, Fabian
Weidlestrasse 7
73560 Böbingen / DE
05 / DELFINI, Stefano
Grenchenstrasse 34
CH-2544 Bettlach / CH
06 / FELLMANN, Willi
Meisenweg 6
CH-4500 Solothurn / CH
07 / LÜSCHER, Bruno
Ackerstrasse 22
CH-4800 Zofingen / CH
08 / BOZIC, Milan
Von Sury Weg 8
CH-4500 Solothurn / CH
09 / MATHYS, Thomas
Schachweg 8
CH-3250 Lyss / CH
10 / GROLIMUND, Daniel
Rainstrasse 37
CH-4528 Zuchwil / CH
Representative(s)Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
[2018/15]
Former [2016/23]Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date14747835.825.07.2014
[2016/23]
WO2014EP02048
Priority number, dateDE20132006920U01.08.2013         Original published format: DE 202013006920 U
[2016/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015014467
Date:05.02.2015
Language:DE
[2015/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3027362
Date:08.06.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015
[2016/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3027362
Date:11.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:B24B23/04, B27B19/00, B23D61/00, B24B45/00, B23Q3/12, B27B5/30
[2016/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WERKZEUGEINRICHTUNG[2016/23]
English:TOOL DEVICE[2016/23]
French:SYSTÈME D'OUTIL[2016/23]
Entry into regional phase26.02.2016National basic fee paid 
26.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/23]
28.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.02.2018Fee for grant paid
15.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.02.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
28.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18166565.4  / EP3366419
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.01.2019   
CORAM TOOLS GMBH
Märwilerstrasse 43b
9556 Thurgau Affeltrang / CH
Opponent's representative
von Bülow & Tamada
Rotbuchenstraße 6
81547 München / DE
 [2019/08]
21.01.2019No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
14.02.2019No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
22.02.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
IE25.07.2018
LU25.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
[2019/19]
Former [2019/17]AL11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
LU25.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AL11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]DE202011050511U  (CHERVON HK LTD [HK]) [X] 1-43 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1852218  (FEIN C & E GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-43 * the whole document *;
 [XD]DE29605728U  (FEIN C & E [DE]) [XD] 1 * pages 7,8; figures 1,2 *
OppositionGB138552
 US3232151
 DE2120669
 DE9114236U
 EP0596831
 WO2006125242
 US5287659
 WO2011141204
 DE3119583