Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3027169

EP3027169 - FOAMABLE PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITION COMPRISING A CONTINUOUS OIL PHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC, a company registered in England and Wales under company no. 41424
Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London
Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[2016/23]
Inventor(s)01 / TSAUR, Liang, Sheng
Conopco Inc. D/B/A UNILEVER
40 Merritt Boulevard
Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US
 [2016/23]
Representative(s)Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
[2016/23]
Application number, filing date14747872.122.07.2014
[2016/23]
WO2014EP65707
Priority number, dateUS201361861001P01.08.2013         Original published format: US 201361861001 P
[2016/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015014667
Date:05.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3027169
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015
[2016/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3027169
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61K8/92, A61K8/02, A61K8/04, A61Q1/14, A61Q9/02, A61Q19/10, A61K8/31
[2016/50]
Former International [2016/23]A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61Q19/00, A61K8/92, A61K8/02, A61K8/04, A61K8/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHÄUMBARE KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT KONTINUIERLICHER ÖLPHASE[2016/50]
English:FOAMABLE PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITION COMPRISING A CONTINUOUS OIL PHASE[2016/23]
French:COMPOSITION DE SOIN PERSONNEL MOUSSANTE COMPRENANT UNE PHASE CONTINUE HUILEUSE[2016/50]
Former [2016/23]SCHÄUMBARE KÖRPERPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT KONTINUIERLICHER ÖLPHASE
Former [2016/23]COMPOSITION MOUSSANTE DE SOINS PERSONNELS COMPRENANT UNE PHASE HUILEUSE CONTINUE
Entry into regional phase16.12.2015National basic fee paid 
16.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/23]
19.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2017Fee for grant paid
10.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.07.2014
AT22.03.2017
CY22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
MK22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IE22.07.2017
IS22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
MT22.07.2017
ES23.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU22.07.2014
AT22.03.2017
CY22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IE22.07.2017
IS22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
MT22.07.2017
ES23.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2019/31]HU22.07.2014
AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IE22.07.2017
IS22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
MT22.07.2017
ES23.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2019/30]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IE22.07.2017
IS22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
MT22.07.2017
ES23.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2019/13]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IE22.07.2017
IS22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
MT22.07.2017
ES23.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2018/43]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IE22.07.2017
IS22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
MT22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2018/39]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IE22.07.2017
IS22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2018/34]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IE22.07.2017
IS22.07.2017
LU22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2018/23]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IE22.07.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2018/21]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
IT22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
NL22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]US4026825  (STEEN HOWARD ROBERTSON ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4093745  (WOOD DONALD C ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2010195694
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 62, Database accession no. 2010-L46367, XP002731765 & JP2010195694 A 20100909 (MIYOSHI KASEI YG) [A] 1 * abstract *