Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3025300

EP3025300 - ON-VEHICLE TICKETING AND VALIDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cubic Corporation
9333 Balboa Avenue
San Diego, CA 92123 / US
[2016/22]
Inventor(s)01 / SMITH, Gavin R.
4 Ritchie Close
Maidenbower Crawley West Sussex RH10 7NA / GB
 [2016/22]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2016/22]
Application number, filing date14748433.122.07.2014
[2016/22]
WO2014US47677
Priority number, dateUS201361857101P22.07.2013         Original published format: US 201361857101 P
[2016/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2015013319
Date:29.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3025300
Date:01.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015
[2016/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR23.12.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/30, G06Q10/02
[2016/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/22]
TitleGerman:ONLINE-TICKETAUSGABE UND VALIDIERUNG[2016/22]
English:ON-VEHICLE TICKETING AND VALIDATION[2016/22]
French:DISPOSITIF DE BILLETTERIE ET VALIDATION EMBARQUÉ[2016/22]
Entry into regional phase17.02.2016National basic fee paid 
17.02.2016Search fee paid 
17.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/22]
27.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201704   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2017
31.07.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2012271712  (KATZIN EDWARD [US] ET AL) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-7D * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0132] *;
 [I]US2012296708  (BACHMANN JOHAN [EE] ET AL) [I] 1-14 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0029] *;
 [I]US2013054413  (BRENDELL BRIAN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0037] *;
 [I]US2012024951  (GRAEBER FRANK [DE]) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2011082714  (GAIKWAD HEMANT [IN]) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[XY]KR20110029270  (KT CORP.) [X] 1-6, 20 * See abstract and claims 1-3,5,6. * [Y] 7-19;
 [Y]US2004015475  (LEONARD SCHEEPSMA) [Y] 7, 8, 14-19 * See abstract and claims 1,2,4,12-14. *;
 [Y]US8219448  (RICHARD A. HALAVAIS et al.) [Y] 9-12 * See abstract and claim 19. *;
 [Y]US2012254040  (PHILIP B. DIXON et al.) [Y] 13 * See abstract and paragraph [0054]. *;
 [A]US2007266782  (SHERMAN L. BARTZ et al.) [A] 1-20 * See abstract and claims 1-3,5,7. *
by applicantUS2011153495