Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2954823

EP2954823 - CLEANING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.11.2015
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/51]For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUDA Tomokazu
c/o UNI-CHARM CORPORATION Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
02 / HASEGAWA Satoshi
c/o UNI-CHARM CORPORATION Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
03 / MATSUYO Akane
c/o UNI-CHARM CORPORATION Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
 [2015/51]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/51]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date14749233.410.01.2014
[2015/51]
WO2014JP50380
Priority number, dateJP2013002274907.02.2013         Original published format: JP 2013022749
[2015/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014122949
Date:14.08.2014
Language:JA
[2014/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2954823
Date:16.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.08.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:A47L13/20, A47L13/16, A47L13/24
[2015/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/51]
TitleGerman:REINIGUNGSWERKZEUG[2015/51]
English:CLEANING TOOL[2015/51]
French:OUTIL DE NETTOYAGE[2015/51]
Entry into regional phase25.08.2015Translation filed 
25.08.2015National basic fee paid 
25.08.2015Search fee paid 
25.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/51]
03.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005005381  (TANAKA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1,2,6,7a *;
 [PXA]WO2013047704  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1-2,6,12 * abstract * [A] 3-5,7-11,13-15;
 [A]WO2006011234  (YAMADA CHIYOE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[A]JP2003265389  (UNI CHARM CORP);
 [A]JP2005237589  (DUSKIN CO LTD);
 [A]JP2007136156  (KAO CORP);
 [A]JP2005278683  (AZUMA IND CO LTD);
 [A]WO2011056940  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al)
by applicantJP2011041828