Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3028358

EP3028358 - MICROGRID ENERGY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A MICROGRID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change - applicantpublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[2019/39]
Former [2016/23]For all designated states
ABB Research Ltd.
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Fang
3510-302 Ivy Commons Drive
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
02 / FENG, Xianyong
11700 Santa Elena LN
Austin, TX 78717 / US
03 / LI, Zhao
3510-302 Ivy Commons Drive
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
04 / WANG, Zhenyuan
2117 Glade Valley Lane
Morrisville, NC 27560 / US
05 / OUDALOV, Alexandre
Badenerstrasse 7A
CH-5442 Fislisbach / CH
 [2017/17]
Former [2016/23]01 / YANG, Fang
3510-302 Ivy Commons Drive
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
02 / FENG, Xianyong
5214 Woodfield Lake Road
Cary, NC 27518 / US
03 / LI, Zhao
3510-302 Ivy Commons Drive
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
04 / WANG, Zhenyuan
2117 Glade Valley Lane
Morrisville, NC 27560 / US
05 / OUDALOV, Alexandre
Badenerstrasse 7A
CH-5442 Fislisbach / CH
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2017/17]Fiorentino, Luca , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Former [2016/23]Postiglione, Ferruccio , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date14750273.623.07.2014
[2016/23]
WO2014US47736
Priority number, dateUS20131395557531.07.2013         Original published format: US201313955575
[2016/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015017201
Date:05.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3028358
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015
[2016/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3028358
Date:26.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/00
[2016/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN MIKROSTROMNETZ[2016/51]
English:MICROGRID ENERGY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A MICROGRID[2016/23]
French:SYSTEM ET PROCEDE POUR OPTIMIZER LA GESTION DE OPERATION SUR MICRO-RESEAU[2016/51]
Former [2016/23]MIKRONETZENERGIEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINES MIKRONETZES
Former [2016/23]SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'ÉNERGIE DE MICRO-RÉSEAU ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MICRO-RÉSEAU
Entry into regional phase21.01.2016National basic fee paid 
21.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/23]
31.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2017Fee for grant paid
20.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.01.2018   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2018/09]
09.02.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.06.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.07.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.07.2014
AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE23.07.2017
LU23.07.2017
MT23.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
FR31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
GB23.07.2018
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE23.07.2017
LU23.07.2017
MT23.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
FR31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
GB23.07.2018
Former [2019/21]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE23.07.2017
LU23.07.2017
MT23.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
FR31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
GB23.07.2018
Former [2018/43]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE23.07.2017
LU23.07.2017
MT23.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
FR31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE23.07.2017
LU23.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
FR31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/34]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE23.07.2017
LU23.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
FR31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/25]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE23.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
FR31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/23]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE23.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
NO26.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL26.04.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2013049547  (CHEROKEE ADVISERS LLC [US]; SZYPERSKI JAMES KEVIN [US]; DARDEN THOMAS) [X] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2010179704  (OZOG MICHAEL T [US]) [X] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2013190938  (ZADEH MOHAMMAD REZA DADASH [CA] ET AL) [X] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2011231028  (OZOG MICHAEL T [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2012143385  (GOLDSMITH STEVEN Y [US]) [X] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2013079943  (DARDEN II THOMAS FRANCIS [US] ET AL) [X] 1,14 * the whole document *
OppositionUS2013190938  * - im Folgenden als D5 bezeichnet; *
 US2013079943  * - im Folgenden als D7 bezeichnet; *
 US7061139  * - im Folgenden als D10 bezeichnet; *
 US2002169523  * - im Folgenden als D11 bezeichnet; *
 US2012283888  * - im Folgenden als D12 bezeichnet; und *
 US2008278000  * - im Folgenden als D13 bezeichnet. *
    - PALMA-BEHNKE, RODRIGO et al., "A Microgrid Energy Management System Based on the Rolling Horizon Strategy", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SMART GRID, (20130602), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 996 - 1006, XP011510773

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSG.2012.2231440
    - BERTANI A. et al., "Management of Low Voltage Grids with High Penetration of Dis- tributed Generation: concepts, implementa- tions and experiments", CIGRE, (20060000), vol. C6, page 304, XP055457481
    - ZHAO, ZHENG, "Optimal Energy Management for Microgrids", Dissertations Chemson University, (20120800), XP055457491
    - BORGHETTI, A. et al., "Short-Term Scheduling and Control of Active Distribution Systems With High Penetration of Renewable Resources", IEEE SYSTEMS JOURNAL, (20100900), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 313 - 322, XP011316515
    - KORPAS, MAGNUS et al., "Operation Planning of Hydrogen Storage Connected to Wind Power Operating in a Power Market", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ENERGY CONVERSION, (20060900), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 742 - 749, XP055457508

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TEC.2006.878245
    - D. LU et al., "Strategic Framework of an Energy Management of a Microgrid with a Photovoltaic-Based Active Generator", 2009 8th International Symposium on Advanced Electromechanical Motion Systems & Electric Drives Joint Symposium, Lille, France, (20090701), pages 1 - 6, XP031530747
    - GHAZVINI, MOHAMMAD ALI FOTOUHI et al., "Regulatory Framework for Short-term Sto- chastic Maintenance Outage Scheduling in Smart Grids", 2012 3rd IEEE PES Innovative Smart Grid Technologies Europe (ISGT Europe, Berlin, pages 1 - 8, XP032332761

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISGTEurope.2012.6465759