24.03.2023 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
17.03.2023 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
03.02.2023 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
15.01.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
02.12.2022 |
Change - French title |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
29.11.2022 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
11.11.2022 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
26.07.2022 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
26.07.2022 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
17.12.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
05.06.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
05.06.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
25.01.2020 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
20.11.2019 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
18.11.2019 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
18.11.2019 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
24.09.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
24.09.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
23.08.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
13.12.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
11.06.2018 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
30.05.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
08.02.2018 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
26.01.2018 |
Opposition filed |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
24.03.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
22.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
20.03.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.12.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.11.2016 |
Change - German title |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
18.11.2016 |
Change - French title |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
07.10.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
02.09.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2016 |
Change - inventor |
|
06.05.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
06.05.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
09.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
23.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|