Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2898459

EP2898459 - SECURING PAYMENT TRANSACTIONS WITH ROTATING APPLICATION TRANSACTION COUNTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2015/31]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRICKELL, Justin Lee
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
02 / BLATTER, Jonathan Kingsley
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
03 / WIELER, Bobby
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
04 / BUTLER, Harry Lee IV
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
05 / BLANCO, Ignacio Carlos
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
06 / LILA, Denis
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/31]Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date14750299.108.08.2014
WO2014US50451
Priority number, dateUS201361897520P30.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361897520 P
US20131413359118.12.2013         Original published format: US201314133591
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015065561
Date:07.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2898459
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015
[2015/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.05.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/40, G06Q20/16, G06Q20/38
[2015/44]
Former International [2015/31]G06Q20/40, G06Q20/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
TitleGerman:SICHERUNG VON ZAHLUNGSTRANSAKTIONEN MIT ROTIERENDEN ANWENDUNGSTRANSAKTIONSZÄHLERN[2015/31]
English:SECURING PAYMENT TRANSACTIONS WITH ROTATING APPLICATION TRANSACTION COUNTERS[2015/31]
French:SÉCURISATION DE TRANSACTIONS DE PAIEMENT À L'AIDE DE COMPTEURS TOURNANTS DE TRANSACTIONS D'APPLICATIONS[2015/31]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2014National basic fee paid 
19.08.2014Search fee paid 
19.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/31]
22.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
23.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/03]
23.07.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
29.10.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/03]
Appeal following examination24.09.2018Appeal received No.  T2659/18
29.10.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2011153496  (ROYYURU VIJAY K [US]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraphs [0014] , [0 31] , [0 32] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0054] *;
 [A]US2013282502  (JOOSTE SAREL KOBUS [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012031969  (HAMMAD AYMAN [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013262317  (COLLINGE MEHDI [BE], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - Keith Mayes, "Smart Cards, Tokens, Security and Applications", Smart Cards, Tokens, Security and Applications, Springer, (20080107), pages 121 - 125, ISBN 978-0-38-772197-2, XP055209227 [A] 1-16 * page 121 - page 125 *
 [Y]  - Michael Roland ET AL, "Cloning Credit Cards: A combined pre-play and downgrade attack on EMV Contactless", Proceeding WOOT'13, Proceedings of the 7th USENIX conference on Offensive Technologies, (20130813), URL: http://0b4af6cdc2f0c5998459-c0245c5c937c5dedcca3f1764ecc9b2f.r43.cf2.rackcdn.com/12055-woot13-roland.pdf, (20150825), XP055209476 [Y] 1-16 * page 3 *
 [A]  - SMART CARD ALLIANCE IDENTITY COUNCIL, "RF-Enabled Applications and Technology: Comparing and Contrasting RFID and RF-Enabled Smart Cards", INTERNET CITATION, (20070101), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.smartcardalliance.org/resources/pdf/RFID_vs_RF-Enabled_Smart_Cards.pdf, (20081107), XP007906278 [A] 1-16 * page 7 *
 [A]  - Martin T. Biegelman ET AL, "Executive Roadmap to Fraud Prevention and Internal Control: Creating a Culture of Compliance", Executive Roadmap to Fraud Prevention and Internal Control: Creating a Culture of Compliance, Wiley, (20120410), pages 193 - 193, ISBN 978-1-11-800458-6, XP055209832 [A] 1-16 * page 193 *
International search[A]US2013262317  (COLLINGE MEHDI [BE], et al);
 [A]US2010262546  (SAHOTA JAGDEEP SINGH [US], et al);
 [A]WO0182246  (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US], et al);
 [A]US2010252624  (VAN DE VELDE EDDY L H [BE], et al)
by applicantUS2011153496
    - KEITH MAYES, Smart Cards, Tokens, Security and Applications, SPRINGER, (20080107), pages 121 - 125