Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3030230

EP3030230 - NEW COMPOSITION TO TREAT INFLAMMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Immperioderm
4 rue de la croix la Rose
76460 Néville / FR
[2016/24]
Inventor(s)01 / MAINNEMARE, Arnaud
15 Haaptstroos
L-6665 Herborn / LU
 [2016/24]
Representative(s)Dennemeyer & Associates S.A.
Landaubogen 1-3
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/24]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date14750308.031.07.2014
[2016/24]
WO2014EP02098
Priority number, dateFR2013000186802.08.2013         Original published format: FR 1301868
[2016/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015014492
Date:05.02.2015
Language:FR
[2015/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3030230
Date:15.06.2016
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015
[2016/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/185, A61K33/00, A61P29/00
[2016/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/24]
TitleGerman:NEUE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNGEN[2016/24]
English:NEW COMPOSITION TO TREAT INFLAMMATION[2016/24]
French:NOUVELLE COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INFLAMMATION[2016/24]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2016National basic fee paid 
27.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/24]
27.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/24]
17.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/07]
10.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/07]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
BE, AT, AL, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG
27.04.2016Request for further processing filed
27.04.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.05.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
27.04.2016Request for further processing filed
27.04.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.05.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
27.04.2016Request for further processing filed
27.04.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.05.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201603   M06   Fee paid on   06.09.2016
31.07.201704   M06   Fee paid on   14.12.2017
31.07.201805   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XYI]FR2819723  (MAINNEMARE ARNAUD [FR]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * le document en entier, en particulier page 27, lignes 3 à 12; page 28, lignes 22 à 27; page 29, ligne 17 - page 30, ligne 30 * [Y] 4-8 [I] 7,8;
 [XY]US2011159462  (ASANO HIROFUMI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,9,10 * the whole document, in particular par.0009, 0013-0015, 0021, 0065-0068 * [Y] 4-8
 [A]  - MAINNEMARE A ET AL, "Hypochlorous acid and taurine-N-monochloramine in periodontal diseases.", JOURNAL OF DENTAL RESEARCH NOV 2004, (200411), vol. 83, no. 11, ISSN 0022-0345, pages 823 - 831, XP009178187 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/154405910408301101