blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3030230


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.01.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
09.10.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.09.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
09.05.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.04.2018 First examination report
09.02.2018 Change - representative
15.12.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
15.12.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
18.11.2016 Amendment by applicant
07.10.2016 Change - extension states published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
12.09.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
12.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.09.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
25.05.2016 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
13.05.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
13.05.2016 Request for examination filed published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
04.05.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
04.05.2016 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
04.05.2016 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
07.04.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
24.03.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
15.02.2016 Change - representative
15.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
12.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
06.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
20.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication