Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3028351

EP3028351 - FEED MECHANISM FOR A TERMINAL CRIMPING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.04.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2017/26]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2016/23]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MORRIS, Michael
3825 Crooked Hill Road
Harrisburg, PA 17110 / US
02 / DEMING, Neil, Edward
907 Silver Lake Road
Lewisberry, PA 17339 / US
03 / WILL, Aaron, Scott
2250 Dewey Lane
Enola, PA 17025 / US
 [2016/23]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2017/26]
Former [2016/23]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date14750945.931.07.2014
[2016/23]
WO2014US49134
Priority number, dateUS20131395757002.08.2013         Original published format: US201313957570
[2016/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015017650
Date:05.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3028351
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015
[2016/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3028351
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01R43/055
[2016/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORSCHUBMECHANISMUS FÜR EINE ANSCHLUSSKLEMMENCRIMPMASCHINE[2016/23]
English:FEED MECHANISM FOR A TERMINAL CRIMPING MACHINE[2016/23]
French:MÉCANISME D'ALIMENTATION POUR UNE MACHINE DE SERTISSAGE DE COSSES[2016/23]
Entry into regional phase24.02.2016National basic fee paid 
24.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/23]
14.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
06.04.2017Fee for grant paid
06.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.07.2014
AT28.06.2017
CY28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BE31.07.2017
IE31.07.2017
LU31.07.2017
MT31.07.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU31.07.2014
AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BE31.07.2017
IE31.07.2017
LU31.07.2017
MT31.07.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BE31.07.2017
IE31.07.2017
LU31.07.2017
MT31.07.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/39]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BE31.07.2017
IE31.07.2017
LU31.07.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/34]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
IE31.07.2017
LU31.07.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/18]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2003110619  (TUREK JAMES [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-7 * the whole document * [Y] 4,8,9 [I] 3,10;
 [YA]US5127255  (SKOTEK DAVID A [US]) [Y] 4,9 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 56 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 5;
 [Y]WO9809356  (WHITAKER CORP [US]; SCHOLLENBERGER MARLIN R [US]) [Y] 8 * page 6, line 20 - page 8, line 26 * * figures 1-8 *