Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3027734

EP3027734 - ISOLATED MICROORGANISM STRAIN LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2017Correction of patent specificationpublished on 13.12.2017 [2017/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BioCC OÜ
Kreutzwaldi 1
51014 Tartu / EE
[2017/47]
Former [2016/23]For all designated states
Oü Tervisliku Piima Biotehnoloogiate Arenduskeskus
Kreutzwaldi 1
51014 Tartu / EE
Inventor(s)01 / OLT, Andres
Sangla 25-8
EE-50407 Tartu / EE
02 / KALDMÄE, Helgi
Kreutzwaldi 40-8
EE-51006 Tartu / EE
03 / KÄRT Olav
Lõhe 28
EE-13516 Taééonn / EE
04 / OTS, Meelis
Tammsaare 5-13
EE-51006 Tartu / EE
05 / SONGISEPP, Epp
Tähe 105-7
EE-50107 Tartu / EE
06 / RÄTSEP, Merle
Alasi 31-49
EE-50109 Tartu / EE
07 / KOKK, Kristiina
Ringtee 31
Tõrvandi
Ülenurme vald
EE-61715 Tartumaa / EE
08 / STSEPETOVA, Jelena
Moisavahe 2-8
EE-50606 Tartu / EE
09 / KÕLJALG, Siiri
Elva tn 6
EE-50404 Tartu / EE
 [2016/23]
Representative(s)Kahu, Sirje
Patendibüroo Ustervall OÜ
Kivi 21-6
51009 Tartu / EE
[2016/23]
Application number, filing date14752554.730.07.2014
[2016/23]
WO2014EE00003
Priority number, dateEE2013000002730.07.2013         Original published format: EE 201300027
[2016/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015014372
Date:05.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3027734
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015
[2016/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3027734
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Type: B8  Corrected title page of specification
No.:EP3027734
Date:13.12.2017
[2017/50]
Search report(s)International search reportEP05.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/20, A23K30/18, A23K50/10, // C12R1/25
[2017/30]
Former International [2016/23]C12N1/20, A23K30/15, C12R1/25
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM STAMM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG[2017/30]
English:ISOLATED MICROORGANISM STRAIN LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 AND ITS USE[2016/23]
French:SOUCHE DE LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 ET SON UTILISATION[2017/30]
Former [2016/23]ISOLIERTER MIKROORGANISMENSTAMM LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG
Former [2016/23]SOUCHE ISOLÉE DE MICRO-ORGANISME LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 ET SON UTILISATION
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase10.02.2016National basic fee paid 
10.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
10.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/23]
08.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.09.2017Fee for grant paid
13.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2011159178  (INST BIOTECHNOLOGII PRZEMYSLU ROLNO SPOZYWCZEGO [PL], et al) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [I]EP1386543  (MEDIPHARM AB [SE]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [ID]EP0580236  (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]) [ID] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - E. SAARISALO ET AL, "Screening and selection of lactic acid bacteria strains suitable for ensiling grass", JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (20070201), vol. 102, no. 2, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2672.2006.03103.x, ISSN 1364-5072, XP055146502 [I] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2672.2006.03103.x
by applicantEP0369198
 EP0580236
 EP0880323
 GB2356125
 EP2312955
 WO2010017568
 US6403084
 WO2006007395
    - MCDONALD, P.; HENDERSON, A. R.; HERON, S.J.E., The biochemistry of silage, CHALCOMBE PUBLICATIONS, page 340,
    - "Biochemistry of Ensiling", ROOKE, J., A.; HATFIELD, G., D., Silage Science and Technology, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF AGRONOMY, MADISON, (2003), pages 95 - 139,
    - "Ensiling of legumes", PAHLOW, G.; RAMMER, C.; SLOTTNER, D.; TUORI, M., Legumes Silages for Animal Production - LEGSIL. Braunschweig, (2002), pages 27 - 31,
    - "Silage additives", KUNG, L.; STOKES, M. R.; LIN, C. J., Science and Technology, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF AGRONOMY, (2003), pages 305 - 360,
    - J.SETÄLÄ ET AL., VALIO, (1993),
    - HUTT P; SHCHEPETOVA J; LOIVUKENE K; KULLISAAR T; MIKELSAAR M, "Antagonistic activity of probiotic lactobacilli and bifidobacteria against entero- and uropathogens", J APPL MICROBIOL., (2006), vol. 100, no. 6, pages 1324 - 32,
    - AOAC, Official methods of analysis of AOAC International, ASSOCIATION OF OFFICIAL ANALYTICAL CHEMISTS INTERNATIONAL, (2005),
    - VAN SOEST, P. J.; ROBERTSON, J. B.; LEWIS, B. A., "Methods for dietary fiber, neutral detergent fiber and nonstarch polysaccharides in relation to animal nutrition", J. DAIRY SCI., (1991), vol. 74, pages 3583 - 3597,