Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3033041

EP3033041 - LIGAMENT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet UK Healthcare Limited
Waterton Industrial Estate
Bridgend
South Wales CF31 3XA / GB
For all designated states
Dodd, Christopher Alexander
1 Tackley Place
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 6RR / GB
For all designated states
Murray, David Wycliffe
Cuddesdon House
Cuddesdon
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX44 9HB / GB
For all designated states
O'Connor, John Joseph
Quarry Manor
9 Beaumont Road
Headington
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX3 8JN / GB
[2019/19]
Former [2016/25]For all designated states
Biomet UK Healthcare Limited
Waterton Industrial Estate
Bridgend
South Wales CF31 3XA / GB
For all designated states
Dodd, Christopher Alexander
1 Tackley Place
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 6RR / GB
For all designated states
Murray, David Wycliffe
Cuddesdon House
Cuddesdon
Oxford OX44 9HB / GB
For all designated states
O'Connor, John Joseph
Quarry Manor
9 Beaumont Road
Headington
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX3 8JN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / DODD, Christopher Alexander
1 Tackley Place
Oxford Oxfordshire OX2 6RR / GB
02 / MURRAY, David Wycliffe
Cuddesdon House
Cuddesdon
Oxford Oxfordshire OX44 9HB / GB
03 / O'CONNOR, John Joseph
Quarry Manor
9 Beaumont Road
Headington
Oxford Oxfordshire OX3 8JN / GB
04 / LLOYD, Russell
73 Sedgebrook Road
Liden
Swindon Wiltshire SN3 6EZ / GB
05 / KHAN, Mohammed Imran
11 Liverpool Road
Reading Berkshire RG1 3PP / GB
 [2016/25]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/25]
Application number, filing date14752912.731.07.2014
[2016/25]
WO2014GB52348
Priority number, dateGB2013001440812.08.2013         Original published format: GB 201314408
[2016/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015022491
Date:19.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3033041
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2015
[2016/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/08, A61F2/38
[2016/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/25]
TitleGerman:LIGAMENTANORDNUNG[2016/25]
English:LIGAMENT ASSEMBLY[2016/25]
French:ENSEMBLE LIGAMENT[2016/25]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2016National basic fee paid 
14.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/25]
14.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
08.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]BE1010569  (DRICOT ROLAND [BE]) [X] 1,13-18 * page 41, line 5 - line 19; figure - * * page 45, line 28 - page 49, line 16 * [I] 2,3;
 [XI]US2008288070  (LO KOKBING [NL]) [X] 1,3,12-14 * paragraphs [0005] , [0019] - [0023] - [0037] - [0043]; figure - * [I] 2,15,18;
 [XI]GB2454251  (BIOMET UK LTD [GB]) [X] 20,21 * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 10; figure - * [I] 1-5,7-9,11-19,23-26;
 [I]US5507812  (MOORE DAVID E [US]) [I] 1,3,4,7-10,13-15,17,18,23,26 * column 4, line 10 - line 60; figure - *;
 [I]WO9736557  (LO KOKBING [NL]) [I] 1,3-9,11,13-15,17,18,23-26 * page 4, line 6 - line 28; figure - * * page 6, line 38 - page 7, line 9 *;
 [X]WO9822048  (INNOVASIVE DEVICES INC [US], et al) [X] 20-22 * page 9, line 15 - line 18; figures 9a-9f * * page 14, line 8 - line 14 *;
 [X]US2007049944  (STONE KEVIN T [US], et al) [X] 20-22 * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0115]; figure - *;
 [X]WO2010017288  (UNIV MIAMI [US], et al) [X] 20,21,23-25 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US5004474  (FRONK DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 23-25 * column 12, line 41 - line 54; figure 7 *;
 [X]US5067962  (CAMPBELL TODD D [US], et al) [X] 23-25 * abstract *;
 [X]WO0245765  (OSTEOTECH INC [US]) [X] 23-25 * page 7, line 18 - line 26; figure 1b *