Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3003796

EP3003796 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO SAFETY HARNESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.05.2018  [2018/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kids IP Limited
2 Fitzroy Place
Glasgow G3 7RH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/15]For all designated states
Kids Ip Limited
2 Fitzroy Place
Sauchiehall Street
Glasgow G3 7RH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CRAWFORD, Alexander
41 Senga Crescent
Bellshill Lanarkshire ML4 1JT / GB
 [2016/15]
Representative(s)Gordon, Naoise Padhraic Edward
Black & Associates Limited
Office 2/1
211 Dumbarton Road
Glasgow G11 6AA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/15]Wilson, Glen
Pioneer IP
272 Bath Street
Glasgow G2 4JR / GB
Application number, filing date14753285.706.06.2014
[2016/15]
WO2014GB51754
Priority number, dateGB2013001007606.06.2013         Original published format: GB 201310076
[2016/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014195726
Date:11.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3003796
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014
[2016/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60R22/02
[2016/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/15]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT SICHERHEITSGURTEN[2016/15]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO SAFETY HARNESSES[2016/15]
French:AMÉLIORATIONS DE HARNAIS DE SÉCURITÉ OU RELATIVES À CELUI-CI[2016/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2016National basic fee paid 
07.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/15]
22.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/19]
05.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201603   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2261591  (ELECTROLUX KLIPPAN LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-7,11-16,18,21,22 * page 8 - page 12; figures 2,3,5,7,8 *;
 [X]WO8200803  (HERSON S) [X] 1-7,11-16,18,21,22 * page 1, line 29 - page 316; figure 5 *;
 [X]DE2834417  (STAKUPRESS GMBH) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB2216392  (BSRD LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-7,11-16,18,21,22 * page 4 - page 11; figures 1,8,9 *;
 [X]GB2215594  (BSRD LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-7,11-16,18,21,22 * page 4; figure 6 *;
 [A]US2013014354  (ROBBINS GENE ARTHUR [US]) [A] 9,10,19,20 * the whole document *