Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2838656

EP2838656 - POLYMER DEGRADATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.05.2015
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ioniqa Technologies B.V.
De Lismortel 31
5612 AR Eindhoven / NL
[2015/09]
Inventor(s)01 / VILAPLANA ARTIGAS, Marcel
p/a De Lismortel 31
NL-5612 AR Eindhoven / NL
02 / MESTROM, Luuk
p/a De Lismortel 31
NL-5612 AR Eindhoven / NL
03 / DE GROOT, Rick
p/a De Lismortel 31
NL-5612 AREindhoven / NL
04 / PHILIPPI, Vincent
p/a De Lismortel 31
NL-5612 AR Eindhoven / NL
05 / GUERRERO SANCHEZ, Carlos
p/a De Lismortel 31
NL-5612 AR Eindhoven / NL
06 / HOOGHOUDT, Tonnis
p/a De Lismortel 31
NL-5612 AR Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/09]
Representative(s)Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/09]Vogels, Leonard Johan Paul
Octrooibureau Los en Stigter B.V.
Weteringschans 96
1017 XS Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date14753318.624.06.2014
WO2014NL50418
Priority number, dateNL2013201102524.06.2013         Original published format: NL 2011025
[2015/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014209117
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2838656
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014
[2015/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:B01J31/18, C08J11/28, B01J31/16
[2015/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/09]
TitleGerman:POLYMERDEGRADATION[2015/09]
English:POLYMER DEGRADATION[2015/09]
French:DÉGRADATION DE POLYMÈRE[2015/09]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2014National basic fee paid 
29.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/09]
14.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
25.01.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination17.03.2016Appeal received No.  T2368/16
02.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
02.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201603   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2016
30.06.201704   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[YD]  - WANG H ET AL, "Fe-containing magnetic ionic liquid as an effective catalyst for the glycolysis of poly(ethylene terephthalate)", CATALYSIS COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 11, no. 8, ISSN 1566-7367, (20100331), pages 763 - 767, (20100212), XP026969540 [YD] 1-15 * abstract *
 [YD]  - WANG H ET AL, "Glycolysis of poly(ethylene terephthalate) catalyzed by ionic liquids", EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, GB, vol. 45, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.EURPOLYMJ.2009.01.025, ISSN 0014-3057, (20090501), pages 1535 - 1544, (20090130), XP026053498 [YD] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eurpolymj.2009.01.025
 [YD]  - XUEYUAN ZHOU ET AL, "Effective catalysis of poly(ethylene terephthalate) (PET) degradation by metallic acetate ionic liquids", PURE AND APPLIED CHEMISTRY, (20120101), vol. 84, no. 3, doi:10.1351/PAC-CON-11-06-10, ISSN 0033-4545, pages 789 - 801, XP055083631 [YD] 1-15 * page 789 - page 790 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1351/PAC-CON-11-06-10
 [Y]  - ZHANG Y ET AL, "Magnetic hydroxyapatite-encapsulated gamma-Fe2O3 nanoparticles functionalized with basic ionic liquids for aqueous Knoevenagel condensation", APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 366, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.APCATA.2009.06.041, ISSN 0926-860X, (20090915), pages 141 - 147, (20090704), XP026467730 [Y] 1-15 * pages 141-142: "1.Introduction"; page 143: "Scheme 1";; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apcata.2009.06.041
 [YD]  - PING WANG ET AL, "Facile Preparation of Ionic Liquid Functionalized Magnetic Nano-Solid Acid Catalysts for Acetalization Reaction", CATALYSIS LETTERS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20100129), vol. 135, no. 1-2, ISSN 1572-879X, pages 159 - 164, XP019787751 [YD] 1-15 * page 159: "Abstract"; page 160: "Scheme 1" *
 [YD]  - RAED ABU-REZIQ ET AL, "Metal Supported on Dendronized Magnetic Nanoparticles: Highly Selective Hydroformylation Catalysts", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, ACS PUBLICATIONS, US, (20060301), vol. 128, no. 15, doi:10.1021/JA060140U, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5279 - 5282, XP003020126 [YD] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja060140u
 [YD]  - ZHANG Y ET AL, "Basic ionic liquids supported on hydroxyapatite-encapsulated gamma-Fe2O3 nanocrystallites: An efficient magnetic and recyclable heterogeneous catalyst for aqueous Knoevenagel condensation", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 306, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.MOLCATA.2009.02.032, ISSN 1381-1169, (20090701), pages 107 - 112, (20090306), XP026121216 [YD] 1-15 * page 107 - page 108 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcata.2009.02.032
 [YD]  - CIARAN O DALAIGH, SERENA A. CORR, YURII GUN KO, AND STEPHEN J. CONNON, "A Magnetic-Nanoparticle-Supported 4-N,N-DialkylaminopyridineCatalyst: Excellent Reactivity Combined with Facile Catalyst Recoveryand Recyclability", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, Wiley-VCH Verlag GmbH & Co. KGaA, Weinheim, (2007), vol. 119, doi:10.1002/ange.200605216, pages 4407 - 4410, XP002714588 [YD] 1-15 * page 4407 - page 4408 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ange.200605216
 [YD]  - FLAVIA C. C. OLIVEIRA ET AL, "Magnetic Fluids Based on [gamma]-Fe 2 O 3 and CoFe 2 O 4 Nanoparticles Dispersed in Ionic Liquids", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY C, (20090521), vol. 113, no. 20, doi:10.1021/jp810501m, ISSN 1932-7447, pages 8566 - 8572, XP055082303 [YD] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp810501m
 [YD]  - QIANG ZHANG, HONG SU, JUN LUO AND YUNYANG WEI, "A magnetic nanoparticle supported dual acidic ionic liquid: a quasi-homogeneous catalyst for the one-pot synthesis of benzoxanthenes", GREEN CHEMISTRY, www.rsc.org/greenchem, (2012), vol. 14, doi:10.1039/C1GC16031A, pages 201 - 208, XP002714587 [YD] 1-15 * page 201: Abstract; pages 202,204: Scheme 1,2,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C1GC16031A
by applicant   - WANG ET AL., "Fe-containing magnetic ionic liquid as an effective catalyst for glycolysis of poly(ethylene terephthalate", CAT. COMM., (2010), vol. 11, pages 763 - 767
    - Eur. Pol. J., PERGAMON PRESS, (20090501), vol. 45, pages 1535 - 1544
    - XUEYUAN ZHOU ET AL., PURE AND APPLIED CHEMISTRY, (20120101), vol. 84, no. 3, pages 789 - 801
    - VALKENBERG ET AL., "Immobilisation of ionic liquids on solid supports", GREEN CHEMISTRY, (2002), pages 88 - 93
    - LEE, "Functionalized imidazolium salts for task-specific ionic liquids and their applications", CHEM. COMMUN., (2006), pages 1049 - 1063
    - ZHANG, Applied Catalysis A: General, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, vol. 366, pages 141 - 147
    - PANG WANG, Catalysis Letters, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, vol. 135, pages 159 - 164
    - RAED ABU-REZIQ, J. Am. Chem. Soc., ACS PUBLICATIONS, vol. 128, pages 5279 - 5282
    - ZHANG, J. Mol. Cat. A: Chemical, ELSEVIER, vol. 306, pages 107 - 112
    - 0 DALAIGH, ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, vol. 119, pages 4407 - 4410
    - OLIVEIRA, J. PHYS. CHEM. C, vol. 113, no. 20, pages 8566 - 8572
    - ZHANG, GREEN CHEM., vol. 14, pages 201 - 208