Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811556

EP2811556 - MANGANESE DIOXIDE, AND ALKALINE DRY CELL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.03.2018  [2018/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / UZUKA, Shunsuke
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
Planning and Management Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / YAMAMOTO, Kenji
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center
Planning and Management Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date14754072.814.01.2014
WO2014JP00119
Priority number, dateJP2013002960719.02.2013         Original published format: JP 2013029607
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014129104
Date:28.08.2014
Language:JA
[2014/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811556
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.08.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/50, C01G45/02, C25B1/21, H01M4/06, H01M6/08
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:MANGANDIOXID UND ALKALI-TROCKENBATTERIE DAMIT[2014/50]
English:MANGANESE DIOXIDE, AND ALKALINE DRY CELL USING SAME[2014/50]
French:DIOXYDE DE MANGANÈSE ET PILE ALCALINE SÈCHE L'UTILISANT[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase02.09.2014Translation filed 
02.09.2014National basic fee paid 
02.09.2014Search fee paid 
02.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
26.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/12]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2002046955  (TAKAHASHI KENICHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5 * page 1, paragraph 0010 * * page 4, paragraphs 0042-0049; examples 1-2 * * table 1 * [I] 4;
 [XI]US2012141361  (SUETSUGU KAZUMASA [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5 * pages 1-2, paragraph 0021 * * page 4, paragraph 0060 - paragraph 0063 * [I] 4;
 [A]WO2012111766  (TOSOH CORP [JP]; SUETSUGU KAZUMASA [JP]; MIURA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 4 *;
 [AP]EP2677066  (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [AP] 1-5 * figure 4 * * page 7, paragraph 0053 *
International search[X]JPH02145434  (CHUO DENKI KOGYO CO., LTD.);
 [X]JP2010251221  (TOSOH CORP.);
 [Y]JP2002348693  (TOSOH CORP.);
 [A]JP2002289186  (TOSOH CORP.);
 [A]JP2008066100  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2004186127