Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2811556 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2811556



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 155
21.02.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.02.2018 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
13.02.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
12.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2018 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
23.11.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.11.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.08.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
23.09.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.09.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
09.09.2015 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
26.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
26.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 18
26.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 18
26.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
26.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.11.2014 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.11.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 5
11.11.2014 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
27.10.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
23.10.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
06.10.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
16.09.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 15
02.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Description Search / examination 15
02.09.2014 Drawings Search / examination 2
02.09.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.08.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
28.08.2014 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
28.08.2014 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 20