Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3028530

EP3028530 - CONNECTED MODE DESIGN WITH BUNDLING CONSIDERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/23]
Inventor(s)01 / XU, Hao
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / CHEN, Wanshi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / GAAL, Peter
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / JI, Tingfang
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2016/23]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2018/05]
Former [2016/23]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14755205.329.07.2014
[2016/23]
WO2014US48549
Priority number, dateUS201361859715P29.07.2013         Original published format: US 201361859715 P
US20141444470428.07.2014         Original published format: US201414444704
[2016/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015017374
Date:05.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3028530
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015
[2016/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3028530
Date:31.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/04, // H04W4/00, H04W52/02
[2017/36]
Former International [2016/23]H04W76/04, H04W4/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DESIGN EINES VERBUNDENEN MODUS MIT BÜNDELUNGSASPEKTEN[2016/23]
English:CONNECTED MODE DESIGN WITH BUNDLING CONSIDERATIONS[2016/23]
French:CONCEPTION EN MODE CONNECTÉ EN TENANT COMPTE DE CONSIDÉRATIONS DE REGROUPEMENT[2016/23]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2015National basic fee paid 
17.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/23]
08.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
23.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2017Fee for grant paid
11.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
IE29.07.2018
LU29.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
[2019/33]
Former [2019/24]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
LU29.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/21]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
LU29.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
LU29.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/36]HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Former [2018/35]HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011222491  (VAJAPEYAM MADHAVAN SRINIVASAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1,15,24,25 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0082] *;
 [Y]WO2012021879  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]; COMSA VIRGIL [CA]; PANI DIANA [CA];) [Y] 3,10,17,20 * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0172] * * paragraph [0224] - paragraph [0229] *;
 [XYI]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Cell Acquisition and Reference Signals for Coverage Limiting MTC UEs", vol. RAN WG1, no. St Julian; 20130128 - 20130201, (20130118), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-130263 (MTC LG), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_72/Docs/, (20130118), XP050663395 [X] 1,11-15,21-25 * paragraph [0004] * [Y] 3,10,17,20 [I] 2,16
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Text Proposal on Coverage Enhancement for a MTC UE", vol. RAN WG1, no. St Julian; 20130128 - 20130201, (20130118), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-130264 (MTC TP LG), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_72/Docs/, (20130118), XP050663396 [A] 1-25 * paragraph [9.5.4] *