Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3046687

EP3046687 - POSTAL SORTING EQUIPMENT HAVING A FEEDER WITH TWO SUPERIMPOSED LEVELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/30]MAIL SORTING APPARATUS COMPRISING A FEED MAGAZINE WITH TWO SUPERPOSED SLIDER BEDS
[2017/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solystic
152-160 avenue Aristide Briand
92220 Bagneux / FR
[2016/30]
Inventor(s)01 / MADAR, François
9 rue Dupont
F-26500 Bourg les Valence / FR
02 / CARON, Arnaud
10 rue de Metz
F-31000 Toulouse / FR
 [2016/30]
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2016/30]
Application number, filing date14755857.110.07.2014
[2016/30]
WO2014FR51780
Priority number, dateFR2013005905720.09.2013         Original published format: FR 1359057
[2016/30]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015040293
Date:26.03.2015
Language:FR
[2015/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3046687
Date:27.07.2016
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015
[2016/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3046687
Date:29.11.2017
Language:FR
[2017/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:B07C1/02, B65H1/30
[2016/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR POSTSORTIERUNG UMFASSEND EIN ZUFÜHRMAGAZIN MIT ZWEI ÜBEREINENDER ANGEORDNETEN NIVEAUS[2017/33]
English:POSTAL SORTING EQUIPMENT HAVING A FEEDER WITH TWO SUPERIMPOSED LEVELS[2017/33]
French:EQUIPEMENT DE TRI POSTAL COMPORTANT UN MAGASIN D'ALIMENTATION AVEC DEUX SOLES SUPERPOSÉES[2016/30]
Former [2016/30]POSTSORTIERVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM VORRATSMAGAZIN MIT ZWEI ÜBEREINANDERLIEGENDEN SCHIEBERBETTEN
Former [2016/30]MAIL SORTING APPARATUS COMPRISING A FEED MAGAZINE WITH TWO SUPERPOSED SLIDER BEDS
Entry into regional phase20.04.2016National basic fee paid 
20.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
20.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/30]
31.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2017Fee for grant paid
17.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)30.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MC29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
IE10.07.2018
LU10.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
[2019/21]
Former [2019/19]CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MC29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
IE10.07.2018
LU10.07.2018
Former [2019/17]CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MC29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
LU10.07.2018
Former [2019/15]CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MC29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/52]CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SI29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/43]CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RO29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]CY29.11.2017
CZ29.11.2017
EE29.11.2017
HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
PL29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
SK29.11.2017
SM29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/25]HR29.11.2017
LT29.11.2017
LV29.11.2017
RS29.11.2017
BG28.02.2018
GR01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]LT29.11.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]US2005077217  (HILLERICH THOMAS A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]US5713713  (SYDE GARY VANDER [US] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * figure - *;
 [A]WO2013093259  (SOLYSTIC [FR]) [A] 1-11 * figure - *;
 [A]FR2288562  (IER IMPRESSION ENREG RESULTATS [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 1 *