Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2961625

EP2961625 - AUTONOMOUS CONTROL DAMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
500 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US
[2016/01]
Inventor(s)01 / BLANKENSHIP, David R.
c/o Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
500 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US
02 / DUNAWAY, Scott S.
c/o Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
500 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US
03 / KAZMIRSKI, Karl C.
c/o Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
500 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US
04 / RATHAN, Mayur
c/o Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
500 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/01]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date14757104.628.02.2014
[2016/01]
WO2014US19400
Priority number, dateUS201361770426P28.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361770426 P
US20141419217327.02.2014         Original published format: US201414192173
[2016/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014134437
Date:04.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2961625
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2014
[2016/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60G17/015, F16F9/32, F16F9/50, F16F9/53, B60G21/05
[2016/47]
Former International [2016/01]B60G17/015, F16F9/32, F16F9/50, F16F9/53
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
TitleGerman:DÄMPFER MIT AUTONOMER STEUERUNG[2016/01]
English:AUTONOMOUS CONTROL DAMPER[2016/01]
French:AMORTISSEUR À COMMANDE AUTONOME[2016/01]
Entry into regional phase27.08.2015National basic fee paid 
27.08.2015Search fee paid 
27.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.2015Examination requested  [2016/01]
04.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/33]
05.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/33]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0542573  (LORD CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,6-9,11 * column 7, line 32 - column 10, line 18; figure - * * column 12, line 35 - column 13, line 30 * [I] 2,4,5,10,12-16;
 [XI]EP0559197  (UNISIA JECS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,6,7,9,11,12 * column 9, line 25 - column 11, line 6; figure - * [I] 2,4,5,8,10,13-16;
 [A]US2011079475  (ROESSLE MATTHEW L [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0052]; figure - *;
 [A]US2005173849  (VANDEWAL BART [BE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0021] - [0022]; figure - *;
 [A]EP2036746  (S&T DAEWOO CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
International search[Y]US2011079475  (ROESSLE MATTHEW L [US], et al);
 [Y]US5350983  (MILLER JOHN M [US], et al);
 [A]US8160774  (LI YUNJUN [US], et al);
 [A]EP1588072  (ARVIN TECHNOLOGIES [US]);
 [A]US2010191420  (HONMA MOTOHIKO [JP], et al)