Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3031231

EP3031231 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING PRIMARY SCRAMBLING CODES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/24]
Inventor(s)01 / SAMBHWANI, Sharad Deepak
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / PICA, Francesco
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/24]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/24]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14758439.504.08.2014
[2016/24]
WO2014US49632
Priority number, dateUS201361864365P09.08.2013         Original published format: US 201361864365 P
US20141421872718.03.2014         Original published format: US201414218727
[2016/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015020973
Date:12.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3031231
Date:15.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015
[2016/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/02
[2016/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/24]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG VON PRIMÄREN VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSCODES[2016/24]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING PRIMARY SCRAMBLING CODES[2016/24]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE CODES DE BRASSAGE PRIMAIRES[2016/24]
Entry into regional phase30.12.2015National basic fee paid 
30.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
30.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/24]
19.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/31]
25.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201805   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2010234028  (NARASIMHA MURALI [US] ET AL) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] * * claim 8 * * figures 3-4, 7-10 *;
 [X]EP2197228  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0038] *;
 [X]WO03041436  (NOKIA CORP [FI]; MOILANEN JANI M [FI]; RUUTU VILLE [FI]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 5, line 10 - page 7, line 32 *;
 [X]US2010178912  (GUNNARSSON FREDRIK [SE] ET AL) [X] 1,6,11,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0044] *