Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3047553

EP3047553 - SHIELDING ARRANGEMENT FOR HIGH-CURRENT APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.05.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2016/30]
Inventor(s)01 / SAUR, Martin
Zedernweg 2
73084 Salach / DE
02 / HU, Zhenyu
Anne-Frank-Strasse 4
71229 Leonberg / DE
 [2016/30]
Application number, filing date14758509.524.07.2014
[2016/30]
WO2014EP65969
Priority number, dateDE20131021872618.09.2013         Original published format: DE102013218726
[2016/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015039791
Date:26.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3047553
Date:27.07.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015
[2016/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3047553
Date:25.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02G3/06, H01R9/05, H02G15/068, H01R13/53, H01R24/38, H05K9/00, // H01R13/6596
[2017/09]
Former International [2016/30]H02G3/06, H01R9/05, H05K9/00, H02G3/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABSCHIRMUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR HOCHSTROMANWENDUNGEN[2016/30]
English:SHIELDING ARRANGEMENT FOR HIGH-CURRENT APPLICATIONS[2016/30]
French:DISPOSITIF DE BLINDAGE POUR APPLICATIONS COURANT DE FORTE INTENSITÉ[2017/09]
Former [2016/30]DISPOSITIF DE BLINDAGE POUR APPLICATIONS HAUTE TENSION
Entry into regional phase18.04.2016National basic fee paid 
18.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/30]
30.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
01.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.08.2017Fee for grant paid
30.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.09.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
15.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/43]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/23]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL25.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XAI]DE69805088T  (AXON CABLE SA [FR]) [X] 1-4,11,16 * the whole document * [A] 5-10,12,13 [I] 14,15;
 [XI]EP1313171  (NEXANS [FR]) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [I] 2,11,14-16;
 [XI]US6007383  (CABES ROBERT [FR]) [X] 1-3,11 * the whole document * [I] 14-16;
 [A]DE202005014601U  (TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH [DE]) [A] 6-9 * paragraphs [0025] - [0031] - [0034] , [0036] - [0037]; figures 1-5 *