Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3033807

EP3033807 - LOW RESISTANCE INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2018/05]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2016/25]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEBOCK, Kimberly Ann
196 Blue Jay Way
Hummelstown, Pennsylvania 17036 / US
02 / FABIAN, David James
366 Kelly Avenue
Mount Joy, Pennsylvania 17552 / US
03 / KLINGER, Brian Todd
2416 Wicklow Drive
Harrisburg, Pennsylvania 17112 / US
 [2016/25]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2018/05]
Former [2016/25]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date14758719.001.08.2014
[2016/25]
WO2014US49328
Priority number, dateUS20131396472112.08.2013         Original published format: US201313964721
[2016/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015023451
Date:19.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3033807
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2015
[2016/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3033807
Date:31.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/06, H01R4/26, H01R4/34, H01R4/62, H01R13/533, H01R11/12, F16J15/06, H01B1/02, H01B5/00, // B64D45/02
[2017/43]
Former International [2016/25]H01R4/06, B64D45/02, F16J15/06, H01R4/26, H01R4/34, H01R4/62, H01R11/12, H01R13/533
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NIEDEROHMIGER EINSATZ[2016/25]
English:LOW RESISTANCE INSERT[2016/25]
French:PIÈCE RAPPORTÉE À FAIBLE RÉSISTANCE[2016/25]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2016National basic fee paid 
07.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/25]
19.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2017Fee for grant paid
18.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
IE01.08.2018
LU01.08.2018
BE31.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
[2019/38]
Former [2019/33]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
IE01.08.2018
LU01.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
LU01.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/37]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
Former [2018/36]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Former [2018/35]FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]FR2704101  (SIMEL [FR]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [I] 8,9;
 [X]US491173  (JACOB L. HAYWARD) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4061413  (KELLER ROMAN) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2796457  (STINGER WALTER E) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *