Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3041432

EP3041432 - ORTHODONTIC APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.05.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dentbend BVBA
Molenstraat 101
1770 Liedekerke / BE
[2016/28]
Inventor(s)01 / REYBROUCK, Koenraad Gerald Rijkaard Lode
Oudergemlaan 185
B-1040 Etterbeek / BE
02 / REYROUCK, Wouter Gerald Herman Rik
Molenstraat 103
B-1770 Liedekerke / BE
03 / SAVOYE, Isabelle Diane
Molenstraat 103
B-1770 Liedekerke / BE
 [2016/28]
Representative(s)Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2016/28]
Application number, filing date14758989.905.09.2014
[2016/28]
WO2014EP68985
Priority number, dateNL2013201138505.09.2013         Original published format: NL 2011385
[2016/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015032918
Date:12.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3041432
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015
[2016/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61C7/14, A61C7/28, A61C7/12, A61C7/20, A61C7/22
[2016/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/28]
TitleGerman:KIEFERORTHOPÄDISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2016/28]
English:ORTHODONTIC APPLIANCE[2016/28]
French:APPAREIL ORTHODONTIQUE[2016/28]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2016National basic fee paid 
05.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/28]
09.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XD]WO2009126433  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]; CINADER DAVID K JR [US]; SOO PHILIP) [XD] 1-3,6,9,10,12-14 * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 8; figure - * * page 3, lines 8, 9 *;
 [X]EP1405610  (ROSENBERG FAREL ARTHUR [US]) [X] 1-10,13 * column 4, lines 1-12; figure -; claims 1, 3, 5, 6, 7, 8 *;
 [X]US3505736  (BRADER ALLEN C ET AL) [X] 1-14 * column 7, lines 26-30; figures 20, 12, 13; claims 1, 2, 3, 6, 8 *;
 [X]WO2011036249  (MELEY ANTOINE [FR]) [X] 1-14 * figures 4, 4bis, 5, 5bis, 6, 7; claims 1, 15 *