Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3036603

EP3036603 - FEEDBACK FOR GROUNDING INDEPENDENT HAPTIC ELECTROVIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/26]
Inventor(s)01 / JIANG, Sam S.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / WEBB, Christian A.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / NORTHWAY, Craig W.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2016/26]
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/26]Wimmer, Hubert
WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date14759402.219.08.2014
[2016/26]
WO2014US51743
Priority number, dateUS20131397374922.08.2013         Original published format: US201313973749
[2016/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015026857
Date:26.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3036603
Date:29.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015
[2016/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3036603
Date:01.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/01, G06F3/041, G06F3/044
[2018/42]
Former International [2016/26]G06F3/01
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:RÜCKKOPPLUNG ZUR ERDUNG UNABHÄNGIGER HAPTISCHER ELEKTROVIBRATIONEN[2016/26]
English:FEEDBACK FOR GROUNDING INDEPENDENT HAPTIC ELECTROVIBRATION[2016/26]
French:RÉTROACTION DE MISE À LA TERRE D'ÉLECTROVIBRATION HAPTIQUE INDÉPENDANTE[2016/26]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2016National basic fee paid 
14.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/26]
29.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2019Fee for grant paid
18.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.05.2019
ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
HR01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
LV01.05.2019
NL01.05.2019
RS01.05.2019
SE01.05.2019
BG01.08.2019
NO01.08.2019
GR02.08.2019
PT01.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL01.05.2019
ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
HR01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
LV01.05.2019
NL01.05.2019
RS01.05.2019
SE01.05.2019
NO01.08.2019
GR02.08.2019
PT01.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL01.05.2019
ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
HR01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
NL01.05.2019
SE01.05.2019
NO01.08.2019
PT01.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
SE01.05.2019
NO01.08.2019
PT01.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES01.05.2019
FI01.05.2019
LT01.05.2019
NO01.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[I]US2012327006  (ISRAR ALI [US] ET AL) [I] 1-28 * paragraphs [0041] - [0050] - [0052] , [0054] - [0060] - [0068] , [0093] - [0113]; figures 2A,2B,3A-3C,4A-4C,10A,10B,11A,11B *;
 [A]EP2375311  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-28 * paragraphs [0024] - [0041]; figures 1,2,3,8A,8B *