Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2966149

EP2966149 - RARE EARTH ALUMINUM GARNET-TYPE INORGANIC OXIDE, PHOSPHOR AND LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/02]RARE EARTH-ALUMINUM-GARNET-TYPE INORGANIC OXIDE, PHOSPHOR, AND LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE USING SAID PHOSPHOR
[2018/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[2016/02]
Inventor(s)01 / OSHIO, Shozo
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property
Management Co., Ltd.
IP Management Department
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / SATO, Natsuki
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property
Management Co., Ltd.
IP Management Department
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2016/02]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2016/02]
Application number, filing date14760290.827.02.2014
[2016/02]
WO2014JP01062
Priority number, dateJP2013004626108.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013046261
JP2013008300211.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013083002
[2016/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014136407
Date:12.09.2014
Language:JA
[2014/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2966149
Date:13.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2966149
Date:10.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:C09K11/80, C01G25/00, H01L33/50, C01G27/00
[2016/14]
Former International [2016/02]C09K11/80, C01G25/00, H01L33/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANORGANISCHES SELTENERD-ALUMINIUMGRANATOXID, LEUCHTSTOFF UND LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG MIT DIESEM LEUCHTSTOFF[2016/02]
English:RARE EARTH ALUMINUM GARNET-TYPE INORGANIC OXIDE, PHOSPHOR AND LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE USING SAME[2018/01]
French:OXYDE INORGANIQUE DE TYPE GRENAT DE TERRE RARE ET D'ALUMINIUM, LUMINOPHORE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT UTILISANT LEDIT LUMINOPHORE[2016/02]
Former [2016/02]RARE EARTH-ALUMINUM-GARNET-TYPE INORGANIC OXIDE, PHOSPHOR, AND LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE USING SAID PHOSPHOR
Entry into regional phase23.07.2015Translation filed 
23.07.2015National basic fee paid 
23.07.2015Search fee paid 
23.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2015Examination requested  [2016/02]
02.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.11.2017Fee for grant paid
23.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.12.2016
Opposition(s)11.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
IE27.02.2018
LU27.02.2018
MT27.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
FR12.03.2018
BG10.04.2018
GB10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/12]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
IE27.02.2018
LU27.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
FR12.03.2018
BG10.04.2018
GB10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2019/09]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
IE27.02.2018
LU27.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
LU27.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2937315  (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-12 * examples 5-12; claims 1-33 *;
 [A]US4093890  (VERRIET JOHANNES GERARDUS ET AL) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]US2012126173  (NASS PETER [DE]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-16 *;
 [A]RU2194736  (SOSHCHIN NAUM PINKHASOVICH) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-3 *
International search[A]CN102703077  (FUJIAN INSTITUTE OF RESEARCH ON THE STRUCTURE OF MATTER, CHINESE ACADE);
 [A]WO2009041297  (TOSHIBA CORP.);
 [A]WO2013005356  (PANASONIC CORP.);
 [A]JP2001192655  (PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH);
 [A]JP2009544791  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.);
 [A]WO2012009455  (INTEMATIX CORP.);
 [A]WO2006049284  (TOHOKU UNIVERSITY);
 [A]JP2007031503  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2003505582
 WO2010043287
 JP3503139B
 US6812500
    - KEIKOUTAIDOUGAKUKAI,, Phosphor Handbook, OHMSHA, LTD., (198712), page 332