Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3047635

EP3047635 - FIELD BUS COUPLER FOR CONNECTING MODULES TO A FIELD BUS AND METHOD FOR ADDRESSING SUCH MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2016/30]
Inventor(s)01 / DAUER, Jörn
Im Dreierfeld 29
33818 Leopoldshöhe / DE
02 / HOFFMANN, Andreas
Großer Stein 15
32657 Lemgo / DE
03 / SCHÖLS, Frank-Herrmann
Senner Strasse 47
33647 Bielefeld / DE
 [2016/30]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/23]
Former [2016/30]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date14762039.712.09.2014
[2016/30]
WO2014EP69546
Priority number, dateDE20131011018516.09.2013         Original published format: DE102013110185
[2016/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015036567
Date:19.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3047635
Date:27.07.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015
[2016/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3047635
Date:06.06.2018
Language:DE
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/12
[2016/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FELDBUSKOPPLER ZUR ANBINDUNG VON MODULEN AN EINEN FELDBUS UND VERFAHREN ZUR ADRESSIERUNG DERARTIGER MODULE[2016/30]
English:FIELD BUS COUPLER FOR CONNECTING MODULES TO A FIELD BUS AND METHOD FOR ADDRESSING SUCH MODULES[2016/30]
French:COUPLEUR DE BUS DE TERRAIN POUR LA CONNEXION DE MODULES À UN BUS DE TERRAIN ET PROCÉDÉ D'ADRESSAGE DE CES MODULES[2016/30]
Entry into regional phase17.03.2016National basic fee paid 
17.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/30]
02.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2018Fee for grant paid
25.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)07.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
MT06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
GB12.09.2018
IE12.09.2018
LU12.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/51]AL06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
GB12.09.2018
IE12.09.2018
LU12.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/47]CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
GB12.09.2018
IE12.09.2018
LU12.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/38]CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IE12.09.2018
LU12.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/33]CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IE12.09.2018
LU12.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/30]CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
LU12.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/26]CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/24]CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/11]CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/10]CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/03]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/52]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/49]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/47]ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
NO06.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2012215874  (SEQUEIRA MELWYN F [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0044] * [A] 5-8 [I] 4;
 [XA]EP2530879  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0051] * [A] 5-8;
 [A]EP2568391  (MINIMAX GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0053] *