Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2971847

EP2971847 - ROD GUIDE ASSEMBLY WITH MULTI-PIECE VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.04.2019
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
500 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / ROESSLE, Matthew L.
c/o Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
500 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US
02 / DUNAWAY, Scott S.
c/o Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
500 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US
03 / BLANKENSHIP, David R.
c/o Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
500 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US
04 / GARDNER, Jeffrey T.
c/o Tenneco Automotive Operating Company Inc.
500 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, Illinois 60045 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date14762991.914.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US28386
Priority number, dateUS201361787004P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361787004 P
US201361787169P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361787169 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014144110
Date:18.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2971847
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16F9/36, F16F9/34, F16F9/346, F16F9/46, F16F9/49, F16F9/50, B60G17/08, F16F9/32
[2016/51]
Former International [2016/03]F16F9/36, F16F9/34, F16F9/346, F16F9/46, F16F9/49, F16F9/50, B60G17/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:STANGENFÜHRUNGSANORDNUNG MIT MEHRTEILIGER VENTILANORDNUNG[2016/03]
English:ROD GUIDE ASSEMBLY WITH MULTI-PIECE VALVE ASSEMBLY[2016/03]
French:ENSEMBLE GUIDE DE TIGE COMPORTANT UN ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE À ÉLÉMENTS MULTIPLES[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2015National basic fee paid 
11.09.2015Search fee paid 
11.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
06.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XAI]JPH07113434  (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [X] 1,5,6,11,12,14 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,7,10,13 [I] 8,9;
 [XA]WO2004067990  (ARVIN TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,11,12,14 * figures 2-4 * [A] 2,4,6-10,13;
 [XAI]GB2164120  (BOGE GMBH) [X] 1,3,5,6,12 * figures 4-7 * [A] 2,4,7-11,13 [I] 14;
 [IA]JPS58211042  (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [I] 1,5,8,11 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6,7,9,10,12-14
International search[A]JPH0626546  (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD);
 [A]JP2002349630  (TOKICO LTD);
 [A]US5967268  (DE MOLINA SIMON ANNE [BE], et al);
 [A]US2006038149  (ALBERT BERND [DE], et al);
 [A]US5878851  (CARLSON J DAVID [US], et al)