blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2970507

EP2970507 - FUSION PROTEINS AND METHODS FOR STIMULATING PLANT GROWTH, PROTECTING PLANTS, AND IMMOBILIZING BACILLUS SPORES ON PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.02.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2024Deletion: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spogen Biotech Inc.
1601 South Providence Road
Suite 120
Columbia, Missouri 65211 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / THOMPSON, Brian
1601 South Providence Road
Suite 120
Columbia, Missouri 65211 / US
02 / THOMPSON, Katie
1601 South Providence Road
Suite 120
Columbia, Missouri 65211 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
Chapel Quarter
Mount Street
Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB
[2024/11]
Former [2016/03]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Application number, filing date14763028.917.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US30824
Priority number, dateUS201361799262P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361799262 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014145964
Date:18.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2970507
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2970507
Date:13.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.2016
ClassificationIPC:C07K19/00, C12N15/62, C12N1/21, C12R1/07, C12R1/125, C12R1/05, C12R1/085, C12R1/00
[2016/36]
CPC:
A01N37/46 (EP,IL,US); A01N63/00 (IL,US); C07K14/32 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A01N37/48 (IL,US); A01N63/10 (IL,US); A01N63/22 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A01N63/50 (EP,IL,RU,US); A61K38/164 (US); C12N9/0095 (EP,IL,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,IL,US); C12N9/20 (EP,IL,US); C12N9/2402 (EP,IL,US);
C12N9/2437 (EP,IL,US); C12N9/48 (EP,IL,US); C12Y118/06001 (EP,IL,US);
C12Y301/01003 (EP,IL,US); C12Y301/03008 (EP,IL,US); C12Y302/01004 (EP,IL,US);
C12Y304/00 (EP,IL,US); A61K39/07 (US); C07K2319/035 (EP,IL,US) (-)
C-Set:
A01N63/50, A01N63/22 (RU,EP,US);
A01N63/50, A01N63/23 (US,RU,EP)
Former IPC [2016/03]C07K19/00, C12N15/62, C12N1/21
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FUSIONSPROTEINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STIMULIERUNG EINES PFLANZENWACHSTUMS, ZUM SCHUTZ VON PFLANZEN UND ZUR IMMOBILISIERUNG VON BAZILLENSPOREN AUF PFLANZEN[2016/03]
English:FUSION PROTEINS AND METHODS FOR STIMULATING PLANT GROWTH, PROTECTING PLANTS, AND IMMOBILIZING BACILLUS SPORES ON PLANTS[2016/03]
French:PROTÉINES DE FUSION ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE STIMULER LA CROISSANCE DES PLANTES, DE PROTÉGER LES PLANTES ET D'IMMOBILISER LES SPORES DE BACILLUS SUR LES PLANTES[2016/03]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase13.10.2015National basic fee paid 
13.10.2015Search fee paid 
13.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
05.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2024Fee for grant paid
02.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP24155327.0
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
16.02.2022Renewal fee patent year 09
14.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US6333302  (BEER STEVEN V [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * abstract; columns 3, 5-9, 11; claims 1-7 *;
 [I]WO0200232  (MAXYGEN INC [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * pages 3-5, 7, 10, 11, 15, 21, 25-31, 96, 98; claims 57-64, 68, 69, 79-82 *;
 [A]US2003228679  (SMITH DONALD L [CA], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract; pages 1 and 2; Example 2; claims 1, 3 and 4 *;
 [A]WO2006012366  (PHYLLOM LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract; claims 1, 6-15, 20-29; pages 3-5, 8-10, 37-39; Table 1; Examples 1-6, 8-10, 12; Seq. ID No. 104 *;
 [AD]US2011281316  (STEWART GEORGE C [US], et al) [AD] 1-18 * abstract; pages 1-4, 6,-8, 10; Examples 2, 5-7, 10, 12, 13, 15-24; Figure 2; claims 1-20; Seq. ID Nos 7 and 12 *
International search[Y]US2010233124  (STEWART GEORGE C [US], et al);
 [Y]EP0792363  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]);
 [A]  - THOMPSON ET AL., "Localization and assembly of the novel exosporium protein BetA of Bacillus anthracis", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (2011), vol. 193, no. 19, pages 5098 - 5104, XP055285091

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.05658-11
 [A]  - JOHNSON ET AL., "ExsY and CotY are required for the correct assembly of the exosporium and spore coat of Bacillus cereus", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 188, no. 22, pages 7905 - 7913, XP055285092

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.00997-06
 [A]  - PARK ET AL., "Spore display using Bacillus thuringiensis exosporium protein InhA", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 495 - 501, XP055285095

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4014/jmb.0802.163
ExaminationWO2016044661
    - Anonymous, "Hypersensitive response - Wikipedia", (20160908), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Hypersensitive_response, (20170905), XP055403755
    - NISSINEN, R. ET AL., "Clavibacter michiganensis subsp. sepedonicus elicits a hypersensitive response in tobacco and secretes hypersensitive response-inducing protein(s)", PHYTOPATHOLOGY, (1997), vol. 87, no. 7, pages 678 - 684
    - PENG, Q. ET AL., "The regulation of exosporium-related genes in Bacillus thuringiensis", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20160125), vol. 6, no. 19005, pages 1 - 12
    - PRIEST, F.G. ET AL., "Population structure and evolution of the Bacillus cereus group", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (20041201), vol. 186, no. 23, doi:10.1128/JB.186.23.7959-7970.2004, pages 7959 - 7970, XP002542279

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.186.23.7959-7970.2004
    - HSIEH, H-Y ET AL., "A Bacillus spore-based display system for bioremediation of atrazine", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (202009), vol. 86, no. 18
by applicantUS2010233124
 US2011281316
    - THOMPSON ET AL., "Targeting of the BclA and BclB proteins to the Bacillus anthracis spore surface", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 70, no. 2, pages 421 - 34
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.