Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2974887 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2974887



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 225
16.03.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
11.05.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.04.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
31.03.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
22.11.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.11.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.11.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.11.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
22.11.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 33
06.10.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
30.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.06.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
30.06.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
30.06.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
30.06.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 10
30.06.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
30.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.01.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
17.12.2015 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
04.12.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.10.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
01.10.2015 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
11.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.09.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.09.2015 Annex Search / examination 1
11.09.2015 Claims Search / examination 1
11.09.2015 Description Search / examination 21
11.09.2015 Drawings Search / examination 8
11.09.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.07.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
07.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
18.09.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.09.2014 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
18.09.2014 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 29