Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2974887


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
16.03.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
07.04.2017 (Expected) grant published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
04.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
04.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.04.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.07.2016 Amendment by applicant
20.05.2016 Change - extension states published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
01.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
18.12.2015 Supplementary search report published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
18.12.2015 Request for examination filed published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
12.12.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
09.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
16.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
12.09.2015 Change - representative
12.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication