Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2974887 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480014304 EP14763135



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10532613Global Dossier 14.01.2020B2
US2016023520 28.01.2016A1
Priority number Date
JP2013050307 13.03.2013
WO2014JP57636 13.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105050833BGlobal Dossier 05.12.2017B
CN105050833 11.11.2015A
Priority number Date
JP2013050307 13.03.2013
WO2014JP57636 13.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2974887Global Dossier 10.05.2017B1
EP2974887 20.01.2016A4
EP2974887 20.01.2016A1
Priority number Date
JP2013050307 13.03.2013
WO2014JP57636 13.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2014230430B 15.09.2016B2
AU2014230430 01.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
JP2013050307 13.03.2013
WO2014JP57636 13.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2633952T 26.09.2017T3
Priority number Date
JP2013050307 13.03.2013
WO2014JP57636 13.03.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014142350Global Dossier 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2013050307 13.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5977696BGlobal Dossier 24.08.2016B2
JP2014172600 22.09.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2013050307 13.03.2013