Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2974887

EP2974887 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/19]
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUNAKI, Naoko
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
Technical Center
3-1-1
Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14763135.213.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014JP57636
Priority number, dateJP2013005030713.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013050307
[2016/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014142350
Date:18.09.2014
Language:JA
[2014/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2974887
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2974887
Date:10.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/04, B60C11/13, B60C11/03, B60C11/12
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LUFTREIFEN[2016/03]
English:PNEUMATIC TIRE[2016/03]
French:PNEU[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2015Translation filed 
11.09.2015National basic fee paid 
11.09.2015Search fee paid 
11.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
30.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2017Fee for grant paid
31.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2016
Opposition(s)13.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/25]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
NO10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS59102409U  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO. LTD) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP2529953  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-9 *;
 [X]EP2154008  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-8 *
International search[X]JP2007191093  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [A]JPH0596913  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [A]JP2009227264  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [A]JP2007230399  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [XP]WO2013035889  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al)
by applicantJP2003205706
 JP2007230399