Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2974405

EP2974405 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH IDENTIFICATION MANAGEMENT AND METHOD OF OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Seungeun
825 E. Evelyn Ave.
APT631
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
02 / GREGG, Justin
410 Garden St.
Golden, CO 80403 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date14763818.312.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014KR02030
Priority number, dateUS20131383297615.03.2013         Original published format: US201313832976
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014142534
Date:18.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2974405
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/16, H04L12/58
[2016/46]
Former International [2016/03]H04W4/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT IDENTIFIKATIONSVERWALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON[2016/03]
English:COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH IDENTIFICATION MANAGEMENT AND METHOD OF OPERATION THEREOF[2016/03]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION AVEC GESTION D'IDENTIFICATION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2015National basic fee paid 
31.07.2015Search fee paid 
31.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
24.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2009300525  (JOLLIFF MARIA ELENA ROMERA [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [ 108] - [0111] - [ 119] - [0121] - [ 126] - [129 ] - [0142] , [ 146]; figures 14a, 17, 19b, 24a, 26 *;
 [Y]US2013040604  (SPRIGG STEPHEN A [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 33] , [0 75] *
International search[A]US2012047206  (MEHRAK HAMZEH ET AL.);
 [A]US2012084813  (MIKHAIL DMITRIEV ET AL.);
 [A]US2011265136  (GAD LIWERANT ET AL.);
 [A]US8364467  (COURTNEY BOWMAN ET AL.);
 [A]US2013057705  (BENJAMIN J. PARKER ET AL.)