Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2973182

EP2973182 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR SECURING USER INPUT IN A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
22.02.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Strikeforce Technologies, Inc.
1090 King George's Post Road
Suite 603
Edison, New Jersey 08837 / US
[2016/03]
Inventor(s)01 / PEMMARAJU, Ram
8 Ponderosa Lane
Old Bridge, New Jersey 08857 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/03]Lord, Michael
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date14763895.115.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US29905
Priority number, dateUS201361794621P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361794621 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014145186
Date:18.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2973182
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/56, G06F21/83, H04L9/08, H04W12/02, H04W12/04, H04W88/02
[2016/46]
Former International [2016/03]G06F21/60
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHERUNG EINER BENUTZEREINGABE IN EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG[2016/03]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR SECURING USER INPUT IN A MOBILE DEVICE[2016/03]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR SÉCURISER UNE ENTRÉE D'UTILISATEUR DANS UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2015National basic fee paid 
15.10.2015Search fee paid 
15.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
20.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2019
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
18.08.2017Request for further processing filed
18.08.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.08.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
18.08.2017Request for further processing filed
18.08.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.08.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005066186  (GENTLE CHRISTOPHER REON [AU], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] *;
 [I]EP1286242  (SONERA SMARTTRUST LTD [FI]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] *;
 [I]EP1473615  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [I] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [I]US2006101128  (WATERSON DAVID L [NZ]) [I] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[Y]US2007182714  (PEMMARAJU RAMARAO [US]);
 [Y]US2009300368  (ZILBERSTEIN AMIR [IL], et al);
 [Y]US2013055315  (REISMAN RICHARD [US]);
 [Y]US2012324242  (KIRSCH STEVEN TODD [US]);
 [Y]US2008033960  (BANKS BARBARA J [US], et al);
 [Y]WO2010123565  (TRUSTED KNIGHT CORP [US])