Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3049243

EP3049243 - PROTECTIVE TEXTILE SLEEVE WITH HOT MELT FIXATION, END FRAY PREVENTION LAYER AND METHODS OF CONSTRUCTION AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC
27300 West Eleven Mile Road
Southfield, MI 48034 / US
[2018/21]
Former [2018/20]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Powertrain, Inc.
27300 West Eleven Mile Road
Southfield MI 48034 / US
Former [2016/31]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Powertrain, Inc.
26555 Northwestern Highway
Southfield, MI 48033 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAGUCHI, Hiroki
4-21-6-502 Minami-ku
Kamitsuruma Hon-Chou
Sagamihara Kanagawa 252-0318 / JP
02 / FUKUYAMA, Shozo
2-9-601 Yokoyama-cho
Hachiouji-shi Tokyo 192-0081 / JP
 [2016/31]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[2018/30]
Former [2016/31]Lessard, Jason Donat
HGF Limited
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Withworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
Application number, filing date14766045.026.08.2014
[2016/31]
WO2014US52721
Priority number, dateUS201361869842P26.08.2013         Original published format: US 201361869842 P
[2016/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015031369
Date:05.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3049243
Date:03.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015
[2016/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3049243
Date:25.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:B32B1/08, F16L57/06, F16L58/10, H02G3/04, B32B5/02, H01B3/50, D06N3/00, // B29C65/18, B29C65/48, B29C65/00
[2018/15]
Former International [2016/31]B32B1/08, C09J7/04, F16L57/06, F16L58/10, H02G3/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TEXTILSCHUTZHÜLLE MIT HEISSSCHMELZFIXIERUNG, SCHICHT ZUR ENDAUSFRÄSUNGSVERHINDERUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR KONSTRUKTION UND ANWENDUNG DAVON[2016/31]
English:PROTECTIVE TEXTILE SLEEVE WITH HOT MELT FIXATION, END FRAY PREVENTION LAYER AND METHODS OF CONSTRUCTION AND APPLICATION THEREOF[2016/31]
French:MANCHON TEXTILE PROTECTEUR AVEC FIXATION À CHAUD, COUCHE DE PRÉVENTION ET D'EFFILOCHAGE D'EXTRÉMITÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION ET D'APPLICATION[2016/31]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2016National basic fee paid 
26.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/31]
04.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2016/31]
26.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/31]
13.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2018Fee for grant paid
14.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)26.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
26.05.2016Request for further processing filed
26.05.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.06.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
26.05.2016Request for further processing filed
26.05.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.06.2016Decision despatched
26.05.2016Request for further processing filed
26.05.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.06.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
26.05.2016Request for further processing filed
26.05.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.06.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201603   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
DK25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
ES25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
MC25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SI25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
SM25.07.2018
LU26.08.2018
BE31.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG25.10.2018
GB25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2019/38]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
DK25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
ES25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
MC25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SI25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
SM25.07.2018
LU26.08.2018
BE31.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/37]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
DK25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
ES25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
MC25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SI25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
SM25.07.2018
LU26.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
DK25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
ES25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
MC25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
SM25.07.2018
LU26.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/23]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
EE25.07.2018
ES25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
MC25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
SK25.07.2018
LU26.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
CZ25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RO25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
LU26.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
LU26.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL25.07.2018
AT25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
LV25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
HR25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT25.07.2018
FI25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
PL25.07.2018
RS25.07.2018
SE25.07.2018
BG25.10.2018
NO25.10.2018
GR26.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI25.07.2018
LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
NO25.10.2018
IS25.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT25.07.2018
NL25.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL25.07.2018
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP2497805  (TESA SE [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-12,14 * paragraphs [0017] , [0031] , [0033] , [0038] , [0060] , [0066] , [0128] , [0129] , [0098]; figures 3-6 * [Y] 6,13 [I] 5,15-19;
 [X]DE202010014239U  (CERTOPLAST VORWERK & SOHN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-12 * paragraphs [0014] , [0027] - [0034]; figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]US5796045  (LANCIEN JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [Y] 6,13 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0886357  (MOHR KARL EUGEN [DE]) [A] 8,15-19 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021]; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2928199  (NEWGREM [FR]) [A] 6,13 * abstract *