Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3047542

EP3047542 - POWER TERMINAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2018/21]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2016/30]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZHAO, Weiping
5405 Waldenhill Court
Superior Township, Michigan 48198 / US
02 / SIMPSON, Douglas Scott
9 Lafayette Street
Mt. Clemens, Michigan 48043 / US
 [2016/30]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2016/30]
Application number, filing date14766341.304.09.2014
[2016/30]
WO2014US53983
Priority number, dateUS20131403193319.09.2013         Original published format: US201314031933
[2016/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015041853
Date:26.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3047542
Date:27.07.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015
[2016/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3047542
Date:23.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/11, H01R13/415, H01R13/187, H01R13/24, H01R13/193, H01R101/00
[2016/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STROMKLEMMENSTECKER[2016/30]
English:POWER TERMINAL CONNECTOR[2016/30]
French:CONNECTEUR DE BORNE D'ALIMENTATION[2016/30]
Entry into regional phase14.04.2016National basic fee paid 
14.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
14.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/30]
31.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2018Fee for grant paid
09.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)26.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
GB04.09.2018
IE04.09.2018
LU04.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2019/40]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
IE04.09.2018
LU04.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
Former [2019/38]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
IE04.09.2018
LU04.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
Former [2019/33]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
IE04.09.2018
LU04.09.2018
Former [2019/30]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
LU04.09.2018
Former [2019/26]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/24]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
NO23.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US6287156  (SWAN JAMES L [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,9,10 [I] 3;
 [Y]EP2375506  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [Y] 5 * figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]US2012315802  (BLAKBORN WILLEM [DE]) [Y] 9 * figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]EP0202564  (MULTI CONTACT AG [CH]) [Y] 10 * figure 6 *;
 [A]EP1622226  (DRAEXLMAIER LISA GMBH [DE]; UNIMET GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 3-6 *
ExaminationUS2003060090
 US6287156
 EP1622226