Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2976785

EP2976785 - TRANSIENT VOLTAGE SUPPRESSOR, DESIGN AND PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.01.2018  [2018/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bourns, Inc.
1200 Columbia Avenue
Riverside, CA 92507 / US
[2016/04]
Inventor(s)01 / WEI, Tao
136 Clover Way
Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US
02 / MORRISH, Andrew, J.
12657 Sun Valley Court
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
 [2016/04]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2016/04]Coyle, Philip Aidan
F. R. Kelly & Co.
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date14767654.821.03.2014
[2016/04]
WO2014US31483
Priority number, dateUS201361803880P21.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361803880 P
[2016/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014153527
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2976785
Date:27.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/02, H01L29/861, H01L29/36
[2017/03]
Former International [2016/04]H01L27/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/04]
TitleGerman:ÜBERGANGSSPANNUNGSUNTERDRÜCKER SOWIE ENTWURF UND PROZESS[2016/04]
English:TRANSIENT VOLTAGE SUPPRESSOR, DESIGN AND PROCESS[2016/04]
French:SUPPRESSEUR DE TENSION TRANSITOIRE, CONCEPTION ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉS[2016/04]
Entry into regional phase21.10.2015National basic fee paid 
21.10.2015Search fee paid 
21.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/04]
27.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/02]
25.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201603   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2012061792  (NOZU TETSURO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] - [0046]; figures 1-3 * [A] 13 [I] 3,4,8,10;
 [XPI]US2013163139  (KASHYAP AVINASH SRIKRISHNAN [US] ET AL) [XP] 1-4,9-12,14 * Fig. 8-12 and the related text * [I] 5-8;
 [A]JP2012109590  (ROHM CO LTD) [A] 13 * Fig. 8 and related text *;
 [A]US2012299146  (TANI TOSHIYUKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0024]; figure 2B *;
 [A]US4200877  (OGAWA TAKUZO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * column 7, lines 33-60; figure 6 *;
 [A]US2010237356  (HANEY SARAH KAY [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0068]; figure 9 *;
 [A]US5880511  (YU BIN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[A]US6734462  (PANKAJ B. SHAH);
 [A]US2008217627  (PETER FRIEDRICHS ET AL.);
 [A]US6388306  (NORITOSHI HIRANO ET AL.);
 [A]US2008042143  (JOSEPH A. YEDINAK ET AL.);
 [A]US2002130331  (MICHIO NEMOTO ET AL.)