Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2970101

EP2970101 - PRODRUGS OF FUMARATES AND THEIR USE IN TREATING VARIOUS DESEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited
Connaught House
1 Burlington Road
Dublin 4 / IE
[2018/23]
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited
Connaught House
1 Burlington Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / ZEIDAN, Tarek, A.
296 Lexington Street
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
02 / DUNCAN, Scott
4 Wayte Road
Bedford, MA 01730 / US
03 / HENCKEN, Christopher, P.
36 Dwinell Street
Boston, MA 02132 / US
04 / WYNN, Thomas, Andrew
94 North Street
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
05 / SANRAME, Carlos, N.
9 Rumford Road
Lexington, MA 02420 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/23]Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2016/03]Harris, Jennifer Lucy , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14767892.414.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US27401
Priority number, dateUS201361782445P14.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361782445 P
US201461934365P31.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461934365 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014152494
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2970101
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2970101
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07C219/08, C07C229/16, C07C309/18, C07C229/12, A61K31/221
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBA10.09.2015
ME10.09.2015
TitleGerman:PRODRUGS VON FUMARATEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VERSCHIEDENER ERKRANKUNGEN[2016/03]
English:PRODRUGS OF FUMARATES AND THEIR USE IN TREATING VARIOUS DESEASES[2016/03]
French:PROMÉDICAMENTS DE FUMARATES ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE DIVERSES MALADIES[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase10.09.2015National basic fee paid 
10.09.2015Search fee paid 
10.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
29.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2018Fee for grant paid
24.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18166993.8  / EP3366668
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.01.2018
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.03.2019   
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 02  06.03.2019   
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Teipel, Stephan, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  06.03.2019   
Generics (UK) Ltd
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2019/15]
Opponent(s)01  05.03.2019   
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
5 Basel Street
P.O. Box 3190
49131 Petah Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 02  06.03.2019   
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Teipel, Stephan, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 03  06.03.2019   
Generics (UK) Ltd
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
29.03.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.08.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2010022177  (XENOPORT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[XP]WO2013119791  (XENOPORT INC [US]);
 [XP]WO2013181451  (XENOPORT INC [US]);
 [A]WO2010022177  (XENOPORT INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO2011085211  (CATABASIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al)
by applicantWO9949858
 US6277882
 WO2005023241
 US2007027076
 WO02055063
 US2006205659
 US6509376
 US6858750
 US7157423
 US6359003
 WO9852549
 US6436992
 US2008089896
 WO2005027899
 WO2006037342
 WO2007042034
 US2012165404
 US8007826
 WO2005099701
 WO2004082684
 US8148414
 US3952741
 US5464633
 US5474784
 US5112621
 US4256108
 US4160452
 US4265874
    - MROWIETZ; ASADULLAH, TRENDS MOL MED, (2005), vol. 111, no. 1, pages 43 - 48
    - YAZDI; MROWIETZ, CLINICS DERMATOLOGY, (2008), vol. 26, pages 522 - 526
    - LEHMANN ET AL., ARCH DERMATOL RES, (2002), vol. 294, pages 399 - 404
    - SCHIMRIGK ET AL., EURJ NEUROLOGY, (2006), vol. 13, pages 604 - 610
    - SCHILLING ET AL., CLIN EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 145, pages 101 - 107
    - BREWER; ROGERS, CLIN EXPT'L DERMATOLOGY, (2007), vol. 32, pages 246 - 249
    - HOEFNAGEL ET AL., BRJ DERMATOLOGY, (2003), vol. 149, pages 363 - 369
    - GOLD ET AL., N. ENG. J. MED., (2012), vol. 367, no. 12, pages 1098 - 1107
OppositionWO2010022177
 WO2011085211
 WO2013119791
 WO2013181451
 WO2012014162
 WO0030622
 WO0151047
 WO02081466
    - B. Testa and J. M. Mayer, Hydrolysis in Drug and Prodrug Metabolism Chemistry, Biochemistry , and Enzymology, Wiley-VCH Switzerland,, (20030000), pages 1-9, 419- - 534, XP055571090
    - A. SAIJA et al., "1-ethylazacycloalkan-2-one indomethacin esters as new oral prodrugs: chemical stability, enzymatic hydrolysis, anti-inflammatory activity and gastrointestinal toxicity", Int. J. Pharm, (19970000), pages 245 - 250, XP055571065

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(97)00197-X
    - F. A. OMAR et al., "Cyclic amide derivatives as potential prodrugs II: N- hydroxymethylsuccinimide-/isatin esters of some NSAIDs as prodrugs with an improved therapeutic index", Eur. J. Med Chem, (19990000), vol. 34, pages 551 - 562, XP004190717
    - M. STANGEL et al., "Fumaric Acid and its Esters: An Emerging Treatment for Multiple Sclerosis", Current Neuropharmacology, (20090000), vol. 7, pages 60 - 64, XP055563570

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/157015909787602788
    - N. H. R. LITJENS et al., "In vitro pharmacokinetics of anti-psoriatic fumaric acid esters", BMC Pharmacology, (20040000), vol. 4, page 22, XP021003039

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2210-4-22
    - SAARI et al., "Synthesis and Antihypertensive Activity of Some Ester Progenitors of Methyldopa", Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (19780000), vol. 21, no. 8, pages 746 - 753, XP055571048

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00206a006