Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2969599

EP2969599 - PNEUMATIC TIRE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
200 4th Avenue South
Nashville, TN 37201 / US
[2018/38]
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
535 Marriott Drive 9th Floor
Nashville, Tennessee 37214 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STUCKEY, Jon
763 September Drive
Uniontown, Ohio 44685 / US
02 / HAYES, Justin
542 Idlewood Drive
Mount Juliet, Tennessee 37122 / US
03 / WEATHERWAX, Kent
224 E. Dresden Avenue
Akron, Ohio 44301 / US
 [2016/08]
Former [2016/03]01 / STUCKEY, Jon
2925 Maplegrove Street NE
Louisville, Ohio 44641 / US
02 / HAYES, Justin
542 Idlewood Drive
Mount Juliet, Tennessee 37122 / US
03 / WEATHERWAX, Kent
224 E. Dresden Avenue
Akron, Ohio 44301 / US
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/25]
Former [2016/03]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14768327.012.02.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US15911
Priority number, dateUS20131384450515.03.2013         Original published format: US201313844505
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014149249
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2969599
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2969599
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60C15/05, B60C15/06, B29D30/18, B29D30/48, B29D30/32, B60C15/00, B60C15/04
[2016/48]
Former International [2016/03]B60C15/05, B60C15/06, B29D30/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LUFTREIFEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[2016/03]
English:PNEUMATIC TIRE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE[2016/03]
French:PNEU ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2015National basic fee paid 
14.10.2015Search fee paid 
14.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
25.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2019Fee for grant paid
10.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19174218.8  / EP3546253
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP1890892  (PIRELLI [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11,12 * paragraph [0049]; figure -; claim - * [A] 3 [Y] 8,13;
 [XAY]US5198050  (GIFFORD JAMES H [US]) [X] 1-7,11,12 * figure -; claim - * [A] 9,10 [Y] 8,13-15;
 [X]US4823857  (ORJELA GURDEV [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,11,12 * figure -; claim 6 *;
 [X]JP3756604B  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0997263  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 13-15 * figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0983876  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 8 * figure -; claim - *
International search[X]US2001001971  (COTTRELL ROGER CARY [US]);
 [Y]EP1512717  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al);
 [Y]US6929045  (OGAWA YUICHIRO [JP]);
 [A]US2012085476  (DONCKELS YVES [BE], et al);
 [A]US6408914  (LAMOCK ANDRE [BE], et al)
by applicantEP1890892
 US5198050
 US4823857
 JPH10217721