Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2967765

EP2967765 - TWIST LOCK INTERFACE FOR ABUTMENT AND IMPLANT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet 3i, LLC
4555 Riverside Drive
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US
[2019/16]
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
Biomet 3i, LLC
4555 Riverside Drive
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BELLANCA, John, J.
10432 Orchid Reserve Drive
West Palm Beach, Florida 33412 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/16]
Former [2016/03]Guardian IP Consulting I/S
Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
Application number, filing date14769219.812.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US24753
Priority number, dateUS20131380480014.03.2013         Original published format: US201313804800
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014151010
Date:25.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2967765
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2967765
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00, A61K6/04
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TWISTLOCK-SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR WIDERLAGER UND IMPLANTATANORDNUNG[2016/03]
English:TWIST LOCK INTERFACE FOR ABUTMENT AND IMPLANT ASSEMBLY[2016/03]
French:INTERFACE DE VERROU TOURNANT POUR ENSEMBLE BUTÉE ET IMPLANT[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2015National basic fee paid 
04.09.2015Search fee paid 
04.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
17.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2019Fee for grant paid
05.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]CH704382  (DENTALPOINT AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10,12-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-5b * [I] 3,7,8,11,15;
 [XI]FR2882919  (HANIA JACOB [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,8-10,14,15 * pages 1-7; figures 1, 2 * [I] 3-5,7,11-13;
 [XI]US6663389  (GALLICCHIO ANTONIO [IT]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,13 * column 1 - column 5, line 16; figures 1-18 * [I] 3,4,6-8,11,12,14,15;
 [XI]EP2361586  (WALTHER GERD AXEL DR [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1, 2 * [I] 3,4,6-8,11-15;
 [A]JP2006075427  (G C DENTAL IND CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
International search[Y]US2008160483  (DANGER KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al);
 [Y]US6663389  (GALLICCHIO ANTONIO [IT]);
 [Y]US2011306014  (CONTE GREGORY J [US], et al);
 [A]US5733122  (GORDON BASIL [US])