Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3042519

EP3042519 - MEASUREMENT REPORTING IN UNLICENSED SPECTRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.05.2017  [2017/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/28]
Inventor(s)01 / SADEK, Ahmed Kamel
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / TOKGOZ, Yeliz
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / YAVUZ, Mehmet
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
04 / KADOUS, Tamer Adel
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
05 / FAN, Mingxi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/28]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/28]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date14771456.204.09.2014
[2016/28]
WO2014US54000
Priority number, dateUS201361873587P04.09.2013         Original published format: US 201361873587 P
US20141447596903.09.2014         Original published format: US201414475969
[2016/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015034990
Date:12.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3042519
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015
[2016/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10, H04W72/04
[2016/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/28]
TitleGerman:MESSBERICHTE IN UNLIZENSIERTEM SPEKTRUM[2016/28]
English:MEASUREMENT REPORTING IN UNLICENSED SPECTRUM[2016/28]
French:RAPPORT DE MESURE DANS UN SPECTRE NON AUTORISÉ[2016/28]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2016National basic fee paid 
02.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/28]
25.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/19]
13.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2017/19]
16.12.2016Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2013083783  (GUPTA VIVEK [US] ET AL) [X] 1-32 * abstract * * figures 8f, 8g * * page 3, paragraph 44 - page 4, paragraph 47 * * page 4, paragraph 53 * * page 6, paragraph 73 * * page 8, paragraphs 89,93,94 * * page 11, paragraphs 132,133 *;
 [X]WO2012121757  (INTEL CORP [US]; ETEMAD KAMRAN [US]; GUPTA VIVEK [US]; HIMAYAT NAGEEN) [X] 1-32 * abstract * * figures 3,4,5 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 21 *;
 [X]US2012307744  (CHARBIT GILLES [GB] ET AL) [X] 1-32 * abstract * * figure 2 * * page 5, paragraphs 102,105,107 * * page 6, paragraph 110 * * page 7, paragraphs 121-124 *