Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2969337

EP2969337 - ROTATING SAW WITH BALANCED DYNAMIC BRAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2018/21]
Former [2016/10]For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2016/03]For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Robert Bosch Tool Corporation
2800 South 25th Avenue
Broadview, Illinois 60153-4594 / US
For all designated states
Voong, Gary
1515 S. Prairie Avenue
United 814
Chicago, IL 60605 / US
For all designated states
Jayaraman, Prashant
887 Bosworthfield Road
Barrington, IL 60010 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VOONG, Gary
1515 S. Prairie Avenue
United 814
Chicago, IL 60605 / US
02 / JAYARAMAN, Prashant
887 Bosworthfield Road
Barrington, IL 60010 / US
 [2016/03]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2018/21]Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Former [2016/03]Bee, Joachim
Robert Bosch GmbH
Zentalabteilung Patente
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date14772753.113.03.2014
[2016/03]
WO2014US26227
Priority number, dateUS201361781931P14.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361781931 P
[2016/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014160283
Date:02.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2969337
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014
[2016/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2969337
Date:23.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR02.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:B23D47/00, B27B5/29, B27G19/02
[2016/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROTIERENDE SÄGE MIT AUSGEGLICHENER DYNAMISCHER BREMSUNG[2016/03]
English:ROTATING SAW WITH BALANCED DYNAMIC BRAKING[2016/03]
French:SCIE ROTATIVE DOTÉE D'UN FREINAGE DYNAMIQUE ÉQUILIBRÉ[2016/03]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2015National basic fee paid 
14.10.2015Search fee paid 
14.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
27.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2018Fee for grant paid
10.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.01.2018
Opposition(s)26.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL23.05.2018
AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
IT23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK23.05.2018
ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
NO23.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2002059854  (GASS STEPHEN F [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0029] - [0037] * * figures 1,3-7 * [A] 2,8;
 [XA]US2002017175  (GASS STEPHEN F [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] * * figure 4 * [A] 2,8;
 [AD]US2011048197  (WINKLER THOMAS [DE]) [AD] 1,7 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2002017175  (GASS STEPHEN F [US], et al);
 [A]US2005268767  (PIERGA WOJCIECH T [US], et al);
 [A]WO03006213  (BLACK & DECKER INC [US], et al);
 [A]US4267914  (SAAR DAVID A);
 [A]WO2010059786  (POWER TOOL INST [US], et al)