EP2968466 - FORMULATIONS WITH REDUCED OXIDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALAVATTAM, Sreedhara c/o Genentech Inc. 1 Dna Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
MALLANEY, Mary 2091 Golden Gate Avenue San Francisco, CA 94115 / US | 03 /
GREWAL, Parbir 1470 Fulton Street Apt 22 San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | [2016/09] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
ALAVATTAM, Sreedhara c/o Genentech Inc. 1 Dna Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
02 /
MALLANEY, Mary c/o Genentech Inc. 1 Dna Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | |||
03 /
GREWAL, Parbir c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Representative(s) | Klostermeyer-Rauber, Dörte F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Corporate Law Patents (CLP) Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14773506.2 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US26841 | Priority number, date | US201361780845P | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361780845 P | US201361909813P | 27.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361909813 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014160495 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2968466 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2968466 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, A61K39/395, A61K38/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
A61K39/39591 (EP,IL);
A61K38/00 (EP,IL);
A61K39/395 (IL,RU);
A61K47/16 (IL,RU);
A61K47/18 (IL,RU);
A61K9/08 (IL,RU)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | A61K38/18, A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN MIT REDUZIERTER OXYDATION | [2016/03] | English: | FORMULATIONS WITH REDUCED OXIDATION | [2016/03] | French: | FORMULATIONS AYANT UNE OXYDATION RÉDUITE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 21.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | LU | 13.03.2019 | MT | 13.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/27] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | IS | 25.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1260230 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [[0047]] *; | [Y]WO2010032220 (PFIZER [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y] - LAM X M ET AL, "ANTIOXIDANTS FOR PREVENTION OF METHIONINE OXIDATION IN RECOMBINANT MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY HER2", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, (19971101), vol. 86, no. 11, doi:10.1021/JS970143S, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 1250 - 1255, XP008038003 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js970143s | [Y] - GULÇIN ILHAMI, "Measurement of antioxidant ability of melatonin and serotonin by the DMPD and CUPRAC methods as trolox equivalent", JOURNAL OF ENZYME INHIBITION AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 23, no. 6, doi:10.1080/14756360701626223, ISSN 1475-6374, (200812), pages 871 - 876, (20081020), XP008181600 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/14756360701626223 | [Y] - SANCHEZ SOLEDAD ET AL, "Tryptophan administration in rats enhances phagocytic function and reduces oxidative metabolism", NEUROENDOCRINOLOGY LETTERS, MAGHIRA & MAAS PUBLICATIONS, SE, (20081201), vol. 29, no. 6, ISSN 0172-780X, pages 1026 - 1032, XP008181599 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | [Y] - STUSS MICHAL ET AL, "N-acetylserotonin reduces lipopolysaccharide-induced lipid peroxidation in vitro more effectively than melatonin", NEUROENDOCRINOLOGY LETTERS, MAGHIRA & MAAS PUBLICATIONS, SE, (20100101), vol. 31, no. 4, ISSN 0172-780X, pages 489 - 496, XP008181598 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | [YD] - JUNYAN A. JI ET AL, "Methionine, tryptophan, and histidine oxidation in a model protein, PTH: Mechanisms and stabilization", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, WASHINGTON, US, (20090519), vol. 98, no. 12, doi:10.1002/jps.21746, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 4485 - 4500, XP055289086 [YD] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.21746 | [Y] - CADENAS E ET AL, Antioxidant activity of 5-hydroxytryptophan, 5-hydroxyindole, and DOPA against microsomal lipid peroxidation and its dependence on vitamin E., FREE RADICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS 1989, VOL. 6, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 11 - 17, (1989), ISSN 8755-0199, XP008181625 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/10715768909073423 | [A] - SHIHONG LI ET AL, "Chemical instability of protein pharmaceuticals: Mechanisms of oxidation and strategies for stabilization", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (19951205), vol. 48, no. 5, doi:10.1002/bit.260480511, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 490 - 500, XP055040145 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260480511 | [AD] - WENTWORTH P ET AL, "Antibody catalysis of the oxidation of water", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, (20010907), vol. 293, no. 5536, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1062722, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1806 - 1811, XP002272072 [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1062722 | [A] - SREEDHARA ALAVATTAM ET AL, Role of surface exposed tryptophan as substrate generators for the antibody catalyzed water oxidation pathway., MOLECULAR PHARMACEUTICS 7 JAN 2013, VOL. 10, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 278 - 288, (20130107), ISSN 1543-8392, XP055289082 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/mp300418r | [T] - GREWAL PARBIR ET AL, "Screening methods to identify indole derivatives that protect against reactive oxygen species induced tryptophan oxidation in proteins.", MOLECULAR PHARMACEUTICS 7 APR 2014, (20140407), vol. 11, no. 4, ISSN 1543-8392, pages 1259 - 1272, XP055289074 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/mp4007375 | International search | [Y]US2010068210 (JI JUNYAN A [US], et al); | [A]US2011171217 (BADKAR ADVAIT VIJAY [US], et al); | [X] - CHRISTEN, S ET AL., "Antioxidant Activities of Some Tryptophan Metabolites: Possible Implication for Inflammatory Diseases.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (1990), vol. 87, pages 2506 - 2510, XP055284307 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.7.2506 | [A] - CAPELLE, MAH ET AL., "High Throughput Screening of Protein Formulation Stability: Practical Considerations.", EUROPEAN JOUMAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS., (2007), vol. 65, pages 131 - 148, XP005823137 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpb.2006.09.009 | [A] - MANNING, MC ET AL., "Stability of Protein Pharmaceuticals: An Update.", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH., (2010), vol. 47, no. 4, pages 544 - 575, XP019793935 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-009-0045-6 | by applicant | EP0003089 | USRE30985E | EP0073657 | US4419446 | US4560655 | EP0183070 | US4601978 | WO8700195 | US4657866 | US4676980 | EP0244234 | US4767704 | US4816567 | DD266710 | WO9003430 | US4927762 | US4965199 | WO9013646 | EP0402226 | EP0404097 | WO9100360 | WO9110741 | WO9209690 | US5122469 | WO9220373 | WO9301161 | WO9306213 | WO9308829 | WO9316185 | WO9404690 | WO9411026 | WO9607754 | US5545807 | US5545806 | WO9627011 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5571894 | US5587458 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5641870 | US5648237 | US5661016 | WO9824893 | US5789199 | US5840523 | US5869046 | US5959177 | US6040498 | US6075181 | US6150584 | US6248516 | US6417429 | US6420548 | EP1260230 | US2005026229 | US2005100546 | US6919436 | US2005176122 | US2005260186 | US2005287149 | US6982321 | US2006059575 | US2006104968 | US7078492 | US7087409 | US2006183887 | US7125978 | US2006258841 | US7153507 | US7189826 | WO2010032220 | - LI et al., Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (19950000), vol. 48, pages 490 - 500 | - WEI et al., Analytical Chemistry, (20070000), vol. 79, no. 7, pages 2797 - 2805 | - JI et al., J Pharm Sci, (20090000), vol. 98, no. 12, pages 4485 - 500 | - FROKJAER et al., Nat Rev Drug Discov, (20050000), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 298 - 306 | - PROUSEK et al., Pure and Applied Chemistry, (20070000), vol. 79, no. 12, pages 2325 - 2338 | - WERBER et al., J Pharm Sci, (20110000), vol. 100, no. 8, pages 3307 - 15 | - LAM et al., Pharm Res, (20110000), vol. 28, no. 10, pages 2543 - 55 | - LEVINE et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the United States of America, (19960000), vol. 93, no. 26, pages 15036 - 15040 | - WANG et al., Molecular Immunology, (20110000), vol. 48, no. 6-7, pages 860 - 866 | - BERTOLOTTI-CIARLET et al., Molecular Immunology, (20090000), vol. 46, no. 8-9, pages 1878 - 82 | - LAM et al., Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19970000), vol. 86, no. 11, pages 1250 - 1255 | - CREED, D., Photochemistry and Photobiology, (19840000), vol. 39, no. 4, pages 537 - 562 | - BABU et al., Indian J Biochem Biophys, (19920000), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 296 - 8 | - BENT et al., Journal of the American Chemical Society, (19750000), vol. 97, no. 10, pages 2612 - 2619 | - MCCORMICK et al., Science, (19760000), vol. 191, no. 4226, pages 468 - 9 | - WENTWORTH et al., Science, (20010000), vol. 293, no. 5536, pages 1806 - 11 | - MCCORMICK et al., Journal of the American Chemical Society, (19780000), vol. 100, pages 312 - 313 | - DAVIES, M.J., Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20030000), vol. 305, no. 3, pages 761 - 70 | - DAD et al., J Photochem Photobiol B, (20050000), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 245 - 51 | - Vincent Lee, Peptide and Protein Drug Delivery, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19910000), pages 247 - 301 | - JONES, A., Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19930000), vol. 10, pages 29 - 90 | - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, Springer-Verlag, (19940000), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - HUDSON et al., Nat. Med., (20030000), vol. 9, pages 129 - 134 | - HOLLINGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, pages 495 - 97 | - HONGO et al., Hybridoma, (19950000), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 253 - 260 | - HAMMERLING et al., Monoclonal Antibodies and T-Cell Hybridomas, Elsevier, (19810000), pages 563 - 681 | - CLACKSON et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - SIDHU et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 338, no. 2, pages 299 - 310 | - LEE et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 340, no. 5, pages 1073 - 1093 | - FELLOUSE, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20040000), vol. 101, no. 34, pages 12467 - 12472 | - LEE et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (20040000), vol. 284, no. 1-2, pages 119 - 132 | - JAKOBOVITS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, page 2551 | - JAKOBOVITS et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGEMANN et al., Year in Immunol., (19930000), vol. 7, no. 33 | - MARKS et al., BiolTechnology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - LONBERG et al., Nature, (19940000), vol. 368, pages 856 - 859 | - MORRISON, Nature, (19940000), vol. 368, pages 812 - 813 | - FISHWILD et al., Nature Biotechnol., (19960000), vol. 14, pages 845 - 851 | - NEUBERGER, Nature Biotechnol., (19960000), vol. 14, page 826 | - LONBERG; HUSZAR, Intern. Rev. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - MORRISON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329 | - PRESTA, Curr. Op. Struct. Biol., (19920000), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - VASWANI; HAMILTON, Ann. Allergy, Asthma & Immunol., (19980000), vol. 1, pages 105 - 115 | - HARRIS, Biochem. Soc. Transactions, (19950000), vol. 23, pages 1035 - 1038 | - HURLE; GROSS, Curr. Op. Biotech., (19940000), vol. 5, pages 428 - 433 | - HOOGENBOOM; WINTER, J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 227, page 381 | - MARKS et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, page 581 | - COLE et al., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, Alan R. Liss, (19850000), page 77 | - BOERNER et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, no. 1, pages 86 - 95 | - VAN DIJK; VAN DE WINKEL, Curr. Opin. Pharmacol., (20010000), vol. 5, pages 368 - 74 | - LI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20060000), vol. 103, pages 3557 - 3562 | - XU et al., Immunity, (20000000), vol. 13, pages 37 - 45 | - JOHNSON; WU, Methods in Molecular Biology, Human Press, (20030000), vol. 248, pages 1 - 25 | - HAMERS-CASTERMAN et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 363, pages 446 - 448 | - SHERIFF et al., Nature Struct. Biol., (19960000), vol. 3, pages 733 - 736 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - ZAPATA et al., Protein Eng, (19950000), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 1057 - 1062 | - KOHLER et al., Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, page 495 | - NI, Xiandai Mianyixue, (20060000), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 265 - 268 | - VOLLMERS; BRANDLEIN, Histology and Histopathology, (20050000), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 927 - 937 | - VOLLMERS; BRANDLEIN, Methods and Findings in Experimental and Clinical Pharmacology, (20050000), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 185 - 91 | - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, Academic Press, (19860000), pages 59 - 103 | - KOZBOR, J. Immunol., (19840000), vol. 133, page 3001 | - BRODEUR et al., Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19870000), pages 51 - 63 | - EVEN et al., Trends in Biotechnology, (20060000), vol. 24, no. 3, pages 105 - 108 | - FRANEK, Trends in Monoclonal Antibody Research, (20050000), pages 111 - 122 | - MUNSON et al., Anal. Biochem., (19800000), vol. 107, page 220 | - HOOGENBOOM et al., Methods in Molecular Biology, Human Press, (20010000), vol. 178, pages 1 - 37 | - LEE et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 340, no. 5, pages 1073 - 93 | - KABAT et al., Sequences of Proteins of Immunological Interest, Fifth Edition,, NIH Publication, (19910000), vol. 1-3 | - WINTER et al., Ann. Rev. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 12, pages 433 - 455 | - GRIFFITHS et al., EMBO J, (19930000), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - HOOGENBOOM; WINTER, J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 227, pages 381 - 388 | - MARKS et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - HOOGENBOOM et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19910000), vol. 19, pages 4133 - 4137 | - ORLANDI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. (USA), (19890000), vol. 86, pages 3833 - 3837 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - JONES et al., Biotechnol., (19910000), vol. 9, pages 88 - 89 | - SASTRY et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. (USA), (19890000), vol. 86, pages 5728 - 5732 | - ORAM et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 4491 - 4498 | - TOMLINSON et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 227, pages 776 - 798 | - MATSUDA et al., Nature Genet., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 88 - 94 | - BARBAS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 4457 - 4461 | - WILLIAMS; WINTER, Eur. J. Immunol., (19930000), vol. 23, pages 1456 - 1461 | - HOGREFE et al., Gene, (19930000), vol. 128, pages 119 - 126 | - WATERHOUSE et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266 | - BARBAS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 7978 - 7982 | - EMBLETON et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 3831 - 3837 | - LEUNG et al., Technique, (19890000), vol. 1, pages 11 - 15 | - HAWKINS et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896 | - GRAM et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 3576 - 3580 | - MARKS et al., Biotechnol., (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - BARBAS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 7978 - 7982 | - BASS et al., Proteins, (19900000), vol. 8, pages 309 - 314 | - SKERRA et al., Curr. Opinion in Immunol., (19930000), vol. 5, page 256 | - PLUCKTHUN, Immunol. Revs, (19920000), vol. 130, page 151 | - RIECHMANN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - SIMS et al., J. Immunol., (19930000), vol. 151, page 2296 | - CHOTHIA et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, page 901 | - CARTER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, page 4285 | - PRESTA et al., J. Immunol., (19930000), vol. 151, page 2623 | - BOERNER et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, page 86 | - BRUGGERMANN et al., Year in Immuno., (19930000), vol. 7, page 33 | - DUCHOSAL et al., Nature, (19920000), vol. 355, page 258 | - MORIMOTO et al., Journal of Biochemical and Biophysical Methods, (19920000), vol. 24, pages 107 - 117 | - BRENNAN et al., Science, (19850000), vol. 229, page 81 | - CARTER et al., BiolTechnology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - Borrebaeck,, Antibody Engineering, . | - MILLSTEIN et al., Nature, (19830000), vol. 305, pages 537 - 539 | - TRAUNECKER et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659 | - SURESH et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19860000), vol. 121, page 210 | - SHALABY et al., J. Exp. Med., (19920000), vol. 175, pages 217 - 225 | - KOSTELNY et al., J. Immunol., (19920000), vol. 148, no. 5, pages 1547 - 1553 | - GRUBER et al., J. Immunol, (19940000), vol. 152, page 5368 | - TUFT et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, page 60 | - STINCHCOMB et al., Nature, (19790000), vol. 282, page 39 | - JONES, Genetics, (19770000), vol. 85, no. 12 | - VAN DEN BERG, Bio/Technology, (19900000), vol. 8, page 135 | - FLEER et al., Bio/Technology, (19910000), vol. 9, pages 968 - 975 | - REYES et al., Nature, (19820000), vol. 297, pages 598 - 601 | - YANIV, Nature, (19820000), vol. 297, pages 17 - 18 | - CHARLTON, Methods in Molecular Biology, Humana Press, (20030000), vol. 248, pages 245 - 254 | - GERNGROSS, Nat. Biotech., (20040000), vol. 22, pages 1409 - 1414 | - LI et al., Nat. Biotech., (20060000), vol. 24, pages 210 - 215 | - GRAHAM et al., J. Gen Virol., (19770000), vol. 36, no. 59 | - MATHER, Biol. Reprod., (19800000), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER et al., Annals N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19820000), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - URLAUB et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, page 4216 | - YAZAKI; WU, Methods in Molecular Biology, Humana Press, (20030000), vol. 248, pages 255 - 268 | - HAM et al., Meth. Enz., (19790000), vol. 58, page 44 | - BARNES et al., Anal. Biochem., (19800000), vol. 102, page 255 | - LINDMARK et al., J. Immunol. Meth., (19830000), vol. 62, pages 1 - 13 | - GUSS et al., EMBO J., (19860000), vol. 5, page 15671575 | - CHAMPE et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19950000), vol. 270, pages 1388 - 1394 | - WENTWORTH et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (20000000), vol. 97, no. 20, pages 10930 - 5 | - ZHU et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20040000), vol. 101, no. 8, pages 2247 - 52 | - IGARASHI et al., Anal Sci, (20070000), vol. 23, no. 8, pages 943 - 8 | - BALTAZAR et al., Curr Med Chem, (20110000), vol. 18, no. 21, pages 3252 - 64 | - CHAO et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19970000), vol. 94, no. 7, pages 2969 - 74 | - DAD et al., JPhotochem Photobiol B, (20050000), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 245 - 51 |