Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2952041

EP2952041 - VERIFYING A USER IDENTITY USING LOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telcom Ventures, LLC
200 South Biscayne Boulevard, 41st Floor
Miami, FL 33131-2398 / US
[2018/48]
Former [2015/50]For all designated states
Telcom Ventures, L.L.C.
200 South Biscayne Boulevard, 41st Floor
Miami, FL 33131-2398 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SINGH, Rajendra
23 Indian Creek Island Road
Indian Creek Village, Florida 33154 / US
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)Yeadon IP Limited
Nexus
Discovery Way
Leeds LS2 3AA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/48]Yeadon IP Limited
Leeds Innovation Centre
103 Clarendon Road
Leeds LS2 9DF / GB
Former [2015/50]Yeadon, Mark
Yeadon IP Limited
Leeds Innovation Centre
103 Clarendon Road
Leeds LS2 9DF / GB
Application number, filing date14773675.512.03.2014
[2015/50]
WO2014US24133
Priority number, dateUS201361782421P14.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361782421 P
[2015/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014159548
Date:02.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2952041
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014
[2015/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2952041
Date:28.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/32, H04L12/58
[2016/41]
Former International [2015/50]H04W40/20, H04W48/04, G06Q20/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERPRÜFUNG EINER BENUTZERIDENTITÄT ANHAND DES STANDORTS[2015/50]
English:VERIFYING A USER IDENTITY USING LOCATION[2015/50]
French:VÉRIFICATION D'UNE IDENTITÉ D'UTILISATEUR AU MOYEN D'UN EMPLACEMENT[2015/50]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2015National basic fee paid 
04.09.2015Search fee paid 
04.09.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/50]
14.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2018Fee for grant paid
20.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2018
Opposition(s)29.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
MC28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
SI28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
LU12.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
[2020/01]
Former [2019/50]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
MC28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
SI28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/46]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
MC28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
SK28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
EE28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
RO28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
SM28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
CZ28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
PL28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
DK28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
IT28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/30]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
NL28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL28.11.2018
AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
PT28.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
SE28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
GR01.03.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT28.11.2018
ES28.11.2018
FI28.11.2018
HR28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
LV28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
BG28.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI28.11.2018
LT28.11.2018
NO28.02.2019
IS28.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT28.11.2018
NO28.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007055785  (STEVENS GILMAN R [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2012052787  (VODAFONE IP LICENSING LTD [GB]; CORNFORTH PETER [GB]; REEVE GREGORY [G) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5243652  (TEARE, MJ ET AL.);
 [Y]US2006046746  (RANFORD, PB ET AL.);
 [Y]US2010175001  (LAZARUS, J ET AL.);
 [Y]US2011179064  (RUSSO, AP);
 [A]US7500607  (WILLIAMS, C);
 [A]US2003169881  (NIEDERMEYER, BJ);
 [A]WO0035216  (OWENSBY, CA);
 [YP]WO2013163326  (HUNTER, KE ET AL.)
by applicantUS2007055785