Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2952041 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2952041



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 186
02.10.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.12.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
02.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.10.2018 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
20.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.10.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.10.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
20.10.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
20.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.10.2018 Request for correction of client data Search / examination 1
16.07.2018 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.07.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.07.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.07.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.07.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
16.07.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 13
13.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
13.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
13.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
13.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
15.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.02.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.02.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.03.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
14.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.03.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
14.03.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
14.03.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
14.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.09.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
09.09.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.09.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 4
09.09.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
09.09.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
01.09.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.11.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
19.10.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.09.2015 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
22.09.2015 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 25
17.09.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
04.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
04.09.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.08.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
10.02.2015 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 13
02.10.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
02.10.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 19